This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 05:50:16 (UTC).

Parchman v. Monsanto Company Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Parchman filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles E. Parchman

Defendant

Monsanto Company Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald P McKenna, Jr

Attorney at Hare, Wynn, Newell & Newton

2025 Third Avenue North, Suite 800

Birmingham, AL 35203-3331

Jason W. Earley

Attorney at Hare Wynn Newell and Newton LLP

2226 Cottondale Lane, Suite 210

Little Rock, AR 72202

 

Court Documents

4 #1

*Restricted*

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E Parchman. Monsanto Company Corporation served on 12/9/2019. (Earley, Jason) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-175) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation.. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols. (jak) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00865. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company Corporation, filed by Charles E Parchman. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075102. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741-VC; Eastern District of Arkansas, 4:19-cv-00865-BSM Parchman v. Monsanto Company, opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-0247 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 175 cc: JPMDL (gbaS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00865. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-175) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation.. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols. (jak) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E Parchman. Monsanto Company Corporation served on 12/9/2019. (Earley, Jason) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company Corporation, filed by Charles E Parchman. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075102. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.