This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2020 at 11:30:41 (UTC).

PARCHMAN v. CITY OF EVANSVILLE et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 PARCHMAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CITY OF EVANSVILLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00131

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIJAH PARCHMAN

Evansville, IN 47711

Defendants

SEVERAL UNKNOWN OFFICERS, EPD

CITY OF EVANSVILLE

Interested Party

DAVID WEDDING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

David L. Jones

Attorney at JONES WALLACE, LLC

20 N.W. Third Street, Suite 400, P.O. Box 1065

Evansville, IN 47706

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Compliance, filed by Interested Party DAVID WEDDING (Jones, David) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Jones on behalf of Interested Party DAVID WEDDING. (Jones, David) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) Addendum to Complaint, filed by Plaintiff ELIJAH PARCHMAN (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JRB) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

4 #1

Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis

#4

(#4) ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - The clerk is directed to include a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the plaintiff's copy of this Entry. Because the plaintiff asserts that the jail will not provide a copy of the trust account absent a court order, the clerk is directed to send a copy of this Entry to the Vanderburgh County Sheriff. Copy to Plaintiff and Vanderburgh County Sheriff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(AAS) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

1 #3

Letter re: account statement

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Exhibit - Prisoner Authorization

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF EVANSVILLE, SEVERAL UNKNOWN OFFICERS, EPD, filed by ELIJAH PARCHMAN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Prisoner Authorization, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Letter re: account statement)(REO) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Compliance, filed by Interested Party DAVID WEDDING (Jones, David) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Jones on behalf of Interested Party DAVID WEDDING. (Jones, David) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ELIJAH PARCHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JRB) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Addendum to Complaint, filed by Plaintiff ELIJAH PARCHMAN (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JRB) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - The clerk is directed to include a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the plaintiff's copy of this Entry. Because the plaintiff asserts that the jail will not provide a copy of the trust account absent a court order, the clerk is directed to send a copy of this Entry to the Vanderburgh County Sheriff. Copy to Plaintiff and Vanderburgh County Sheriff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(AAS) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF EVANSVILLE, SEVERAL UNKNOWN OFFICERS, EPD, filed by ELIJAH PARCHMAN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Prisoner Authorization, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Letter re: account statement)(REO) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L. Jones