This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2020 at 07:01:21 (UTC).

Parcel Partners v. Shopify

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 Parcel Partners filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Shopify. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dee Benson and Daphne A. Oberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00253

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dee Benson

Referral Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parcel Partners

Defendant

Shopify

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan R. Marigoni

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

201 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2221

Jason D. Boren

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

201 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2221

Defendant Attorneys

Heidi G. Goebel

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Rachael M. Trummel

Attorney at KING & SPALDING LLP

353 N Clark St 12Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60654

Andrew J. Chinsky

Attorney at KING & SPALDING LLP

353 N Clark St 12Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

15 #1

Exhibit Application

#15

14 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit Application

#14

#13

#11

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

2 #3

Exhibit B: (Redacted) Second Amending Agreement

2 #2

Exhibit A: (Redacted) Referral Agreement

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Initiating Court Cover Sheet

#2

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew J. Chinsky for Shopify.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/3/20. (dla) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rachael M. Trummel for Shopify.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/3/20. (dla) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Chinsky , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3590522,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Shopify. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachael M. Trummel , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3590512,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendant Shopify. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Attorney Heidi G. Goebel added to party Shopify(pty:dft)(Goebel, Heidi) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Parcel Partners as to Shopify Waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Boren, Jason) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#12) REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:20cv253-DB-DAO. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (dla) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/22/20. (dla) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 4/22/2020. No attached document. (nas) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/21/2020. (reb) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Shopify. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Parcel Partners. (Boren, Jason) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was emailed to the court on 4/15/2020, but the filing fee was not paid until 4/16/2020. Correction: changed filed date on the case to 4/16/2020 re #2 Complaint. (nl) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Seal Document #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support , #2 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Parcel PartnersNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Boren, Jason) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **SEALED DOCUMENT** re #3 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Seal Document #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support , #2 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Parcel PartnersNOTE: Filer is instructed to serve the sealed document on all other parties.. (Boren, Jason) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION to Seal Document #2 Complaint, and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Parcel Partners. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boren, Jason) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Shopify (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3549197) filed by Parcel Partners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Initiating Court Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: (Redacted) Referral Agreement, #3 Exhibit B: (Redacted) Second Amending Agreement) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Boren, Jason) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Plaintiff Parcel Partners is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (jl) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shopify, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachael M Trummel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Jacob Chinsky

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heidi G. Goebel