This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 12:24:42 (UTC).

PARAMESWARAN v. WOLF et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 PARAMESWARAN filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against WOLF. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00187

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DHILEEPAN PARAMESWARAN

Not Classified By Court

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

CHAD WOLF

SARAH KENDALL

Washington, DC 20529

KENNETH CUCCINELLI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H. Ronald Klasko

Attorney at KLASKO IMMIGRATION LAW PARTNERS, LLP

1601 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/31/20. (DM) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/31/20. (DM) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH CUCCINELLI, SARAH KENDALL, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, CHAD WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ERRATA re #1 COMPLAINT filed by DHILEEPAN PARAMESWARAN.(Klasko, H.) Modified on 1/28/2020 to correct docket text (zsb). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KENNETH CUCCINELLI, SARAH KENDALL, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, CHAD WOLF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6760562) filed by DHILEEPAN PARAMESWARAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Wolf, #3 Summons Cuccinelli, #4 Summons Kendall, #5 Summons USCIS, #6 Summons Civil process Clerk, #7 Summons Attorney General)(Klasko, H.) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.