This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2021 at 11:38:22 (UTC).

Paradise Medical Group, Inc. v. TP-ACO, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Paradise Medical Group, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TP-ACO, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Dennis M. Cota. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00391

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Dennis M. Cota

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Paradise Medical Group, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

TP-ACO, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Candice P. Shih

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jeremy M. King, PHV

Attorney at Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP

1325 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

John T. Cu

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett Llp

425 Market Street, 26Th Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Melville Zachary Smith

Attorney at Weintraub Tobin

400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1100

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) STIPULATION to Extend the Time to File a Response to the Counterclaim by Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Shih, Candice) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

17 #1

Defendant TP-ACO, LLC's Counterclaim

#17

(#17) ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against Paradise Medical Group, Inc. by TP-ACO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendant TP-ACO, LLC's Counterclaim)(Smith, Melville) Modified on 4/7/2021 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#16

(#16) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/1/2021 ADDING attorney Jeremy M. King, PHV for Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#15

(#15) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Paradise Medical Group, Inc. for attorney Jeremy McGuire King to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9513971) (Shih, Candice) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Cu, John) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John T. Cu on behalf of Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. Attorney Cu, John T. added. (Cu, John) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of ERRATA by TP-ACO, LLC re #8 Stipulation to Extend Time. (Smith, Melville) Modified on 3/11/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by TP-ACO, LLC re #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Smith, Melville) Modified on 3/10/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant TP-ACO, LLC. (Smith, Melville) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint by TP-ACO, LLC. (Smith, Melville) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by TP-ACO, LLC re Minute Order (ECF No. 5). (Smith, Melville) Modified on 3/4/2021 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

4 #3

VDRP

4 #2

Consent Form

4 #1

Standing Order

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by TP-ACO, LLC (Smith, Melville) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Butte County Superior Court, case number 21CV00267 by TP-ACO, LLC . (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9448539) (Smith, Melville) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION to Extend the Time to File a Response to the Counterclaim by Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Shih, Candice) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against Paradise Medical Group, Inc. by TP-ACO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendant TP-ACO, LLC's Counterclaim)(Smith, Melville) Modified on 4/7/2021 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/1/2021 ADDING attorney Jeremy M. King, PHV for Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Paradise Medical Group, Inc. for attorney Jeremy McGuire King to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9513971) (Shih, Candice) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Cu, John) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John T. Cu on behalf of Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. Attorney Cu, John T. added. (Cu, John) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of ERRATA by TP-ACO, LLC re #8 Stipulation to Extend Time. (Smith, Melville) Modified on 3/11/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/10/2021: The court is in receipt of the parties' Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 30-Days, ECF No. #8 . Local Rule 144(a) allows parties to stipulate to a maximum extension of 28-days. Accordingly, Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due no later than 4/6/2021. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by TP-ACO, LLC re #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Smith, Melville) Modified on 3/10/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant TP-ACO, LLC. (Smith, Melville) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint by TP-ACO, LLC. (Smith, Melville) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C.Pine for Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/4/2021: (Text Only Entry), Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in Redding before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this minute order on defendants not yet appearing.(Pine, C) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by TP-ACO, LLC re Minute Order (ECF No. 5). (Smith, Melville) Modified on 3/4/2021 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/3/2021 ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 7/8/2021 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED, and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by TP-ACO, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Smith, Melville) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by TP-ACO, LLC (Smith, Melville) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Butte County Superior Court, case number 21CV00267 by TP-ACO, LLC . (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9448539) (Smith, Melville) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paradise Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant