This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2021 at 09:39:53 (UTC).

Paradise IP LLC v. Spotify USA Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Paradise IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Spotify USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00601

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paradise IP LLC

Defendant

Spotify USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Spotify USA Inc. answer due 7/8/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/7/2021. (nms) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 07/08/2021 - filed by Paradise IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00597-RGA, 1:21-cv-00598-RGA, 1:21-cv-00599-RGA, 1:21-cv-00600-RGA, 1:21-cv-00601-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paradise IP LLC. Spotify USA Inc. served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Paradise IP LLC. (myr) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,200,613 ;7,791,741. (myr) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Spotify USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3603395.) - filed by Paradise IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paradise IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Spotify USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong