This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2020 at 09:40:32 (UTC).

Pappas v. Medtronic Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Pappas filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02016

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paulina Pappas

Defendants

Medtronic Incorporated

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Company

Medtronic Logistics LLC

Medtronic USA Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ellen A Presby

Attorney at Van Wey Presby & Williams PLLC

12720 Hillcrest Rd., Ste. 600

Dallas, TX 75230

Laura J Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3141 Hood St., Ste. 600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/22/2020. (RMV) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18788715. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02016-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18788715 filed by Paulina Pappas. (Presby, Ellen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(SCA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Laura J Baughman on behalf of Plaintiff Paulina Pappas. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/22/2020. (RMV) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Paulina Pappas. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SCA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18788715. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02016-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18788715 filed by Paulina Pappas. (Presby, Ellen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(SCA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellen A. Presby