This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2021 at 08:18:40 (UTC).

Paper Profits, LLC v. Alvarenga et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Paper Profits, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Alvarenga. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric N. Vitaliano and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05375

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paper Profits, LLC

Defendants

Santos J Alvarenga

Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violation Agency

People of the State of New York o/b/o Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court

Royal Prestige Inexmo

JOHN DOE

JANE DOE

Santos J. Alvarenga

People of the State of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arsenio David Rodriguez

Attorney at Stern & Eisenberg P.C.

485B Route 1 S., Ste. 330Suite 330

Iselin, NJ 08830

 

Court Documents

9 #3

Summons #4

9 #2

Summons #3

9 #1

Summons #2

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#7

(#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit F-Judgment Creditors

1 #5

Exhibit E-Demand Letters /Property Registration

1 #4

Exhibit D-Assignments of Mortgage

1 #3

Exhibit C-Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B-Equity Reserve Line of Credit

1 #1

Exhibit A-Schedule A Property Description

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Santos J. Alvarenga, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violation Agency, People of the State of New York, Royal Prestige Inexmo. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2, #2 Summons #3, #3 Summons #4) (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Paper Profits, LLC (Rodriguez, Arsenio) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Paper Profits, LLC (Rodriguez, Arsenio) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Paper Profits, LLC (Rodriguez, Arsenio) (Main Document 4 replaced for statistical purposes- original pdf flagged as corrupt on 9/30/2021) (Jakubowski, Laura). (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by Paper Profits, LLC (Rodriguez, Arsenio) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Paper Profits, LLC (Rodriguez, Arsenio) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Paper Profits, LLC against Santos J Alvarenga, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violation Agency, JANE Doe, John Doe, People of the State of New York, Royal Prestige Inexmo filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14879308 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Paper Profits, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Schedule A Property Description, #2 Exhibit B-Equity Reserve Line of Credit, #3 Exhibit C-Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D-Assignments of Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E-Demand Letters /Property Registration, #6 Exhibit F-Judgment Creditors) (Rodriguez, Arsenio) Modified on 9/29/2021 (Landow, Concetta). (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAPER PROFITS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic and Parking Violations Agency is a litigant