This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 10:22:31 (UTC).

Panther Innovations, LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On June 25, 2021, Panther Innovations, LLC (“Panther” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis of The Stafford Davis Firm, PC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against LG Electronics, Inc. (“LG Korea”), LG Display Co. Ltd. (“LG Display”), LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (“LG USA”) and LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. (“LG Alabama”) (collectively referred to as “Defendants”), seeking an accounting of damages and treble damages among other reliefs for alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by Plaintiff. This case is filed in the U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for Defendants’ alleged unlawful infringement of the United States patent owned by Panther, United States Patent Number 9,712,811 titled “Viewing of Different Full-Screen Television Content by Different Viewers at the Same Time Using Configured Glasses and a Related Display” (the “’811 Patent”) (the “Accused Product”).

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “LG has directly infringed the ’811 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a) by performing methods, including its own use and testing of the Dual Play feature (an “Accused Product”) that embodies the patented inventions of at least claim 1 of the ’811 Patent.” And that “The Accused Products satisfy each and every element of each asserted claim of the ’811 Patent either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents.”

 

Further, the Plaintiff alleged that “LG is liable for indirect infringement under 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) of at least claim 1 of the ’811 Patent at least as early as 2013 when it received notice from Mr. Keys because it knowingly encourages, aids, and directs others (e.g., end users and customers) to use and operate the Accused Products in an infringing manner and to perform the claimed methods of the ’811 Patent.”

 

There is only one claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff which is for the alleged infringement of the ‘811 patent, wherein the Plaintiff has alleged that as a result of Defendant’s infringement of the ’811 Patent, Defendants have damaged Panther, and Panther is entitled to monetary damages in an amount to be determined at trial that is adequate to compensate for Defendants’ infringement, but in no event less than a reasonable royalty for the use made of the invention by Defendants, together with interest and costs as fixed by the Court pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284.

 

In its prayer, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to pass a judgment that Defendant has infringed the ’811 patent, order an accounting and an award to Plaintiff of damages adequate to compensate Plaintiff together with pre-judgment and post-judgment interest, and award treble damages along with costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 






Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00232

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Panther Innovations, LLC

Defendants

LG Electronics, Inc.

LG Display Co., Ltd.

LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cabrach John Connor

Attorney at Connor Lee PLLC - Austin

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

Catherine Susan Bartles

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC - Tyler

815 S Broadway Ave

Tyler, TX 75701

Jennifer Tatum Lee

Attorney at Connor Lee PLLC - Austin

609 Castle Ridge Road, Suite 450

Austin, TX 78746

Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis

Attorney at The Stafford Davis Firm, PC - Tyler

815 S Broadway Ave

Tyler, TX 75701

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Panther Innovations, LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Tatum Lee on behalf of Panther Innovations, LLC (Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cabrach John Connor on behalf of Panther Innovations, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

4 #3

Summons(es)

4 #2

Summons(es)

4 #1

Summons(es)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Panther Innovations, LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - US 9,712,811

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8470791.), filed by Panther Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 9,712,811, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Panther Innovations, LLC (Bartles, Catherine) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Tatum Lee on behalf of Panther Innovations, LLC (Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cabrach John Connor on behalf of Panther Innovations, LLC (Connor, Cabrach) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Panther Innovations, LLC (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8470791.), filed by Panther Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 9,712,811, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG DISPLAY CO., LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cabrach J. Connor