This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:31:25 (UTC).

Panoramic Stock Images LTD v. Prince George Community Association

Case Summary

On October 27, 2021, Panoramic Stock Images, LTD., DBA Panoramic Images ( “Plaintiff”), represented by Hunter S Freeman of Burr and Forman LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Prince George Community Association ("PGCA" or “Defendant”) seeking injunctive relief and damages for the alleged infringement of United States Copyright owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the District of South Carolina with Judge Richard M. Gergel presiding.

Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of United States Copyright i.e. Panoramic created the photograph entitled "38688 Cape Hatteras National Park, Outer banks, NC USA June 5, 1998" (the "Work") owned by Plaintiff.

In the complaint Plaintiff alleged that, “Panoramic brings this action for violations of exclusive rights under the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. § 106, to copy and distribute Panoramic's original copyrighted Work of authorship. Panoramic has specialized in wide and large-format panoramic photography for over 25 years. Their global roster of acclaimed photographers captures the world in awe- inspiring size to create a collection of international images: city skylines, landscapes, travel,  lifestyles, cultural heritage, world destinations and aerials.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “PGCA is an informational company about the unique Prince George community. At all times relevant herein, PGCA owned and operated the internet website located at the URL www.pgca.info (the "Website"). The Website features information about the Prince George Community such as history, amenities, community documents and also a resident hub. Panoramic alleges that PGCA copied Panoramic's copyrighted Work from the internet in order to advertise, market and promote its business activities. PGCA committed the violations alleged in connection with PGCA's business for purposes of advertising and promoting sales to the public in the course and scope of the PGCA's business.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “PGCA copied and distributed Panoramic's copyrighted Work in connection with PGCA's business for purposes of advertising and promoting PGCA's business, and in the course and scope of advertising and selling products and services. Panoramic never gave PGCA permission or authority to copy, distribute or display the Work at issue in this case. PGCA's acts were willful and Panoramic has been damaged.”

There is only one claim for relief laid down by Plaintiff which deals with the alleged copyright infringement.

In its prayer for relief Plaintiff has requested the court that Defendant and its officers, agents, servants, employees, affiliated entities, and all of those in active concert with them, be preliminarily and permanently enjoined from committing the acts alleged herein in violation of 17 U.S.C. § 501. Plaintiff also requested the court that Defendant be required to pay Plaintiff its actual damages and PGCA's profits attributable to the infringement, or, at Plaintiffs election, statutory damages, as provided in 17 U.S.C. § 504. Further, Plaintiff requested to be awarded its attorneys' fees and costs of suit along with pre- and post-judgement interest. Plaintiff also requested the court for such other and further relief as the court deems just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03532

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Panoramic Stock Images LTD doing business as Panoramic Images

Defendant

Prince George Community Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunter S Freeman

Attorney at Burr and Forman LLP-Gville

104 S Main Street, Suite 700

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendant Attorneys

Morgan S Templeton

Attorney at Wall Templeton and Haldrup

145 King Street, Suite 300

Charleston, SC 29401

Stephanie Paige Brown

Attorney at Wall Templeton and Haldrup

145 King Street, Suite 300

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Prince George Community Association ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10151169.), filed by Panoramic Stock Images LTD. Service due by 1/26/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Webpage, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters)(sshe, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Registration

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Webpage

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Panoramic Stock Images LTD.(sshe, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Prince George Community Association. (sshe, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (sshe, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Panoramic Stock Images LTD. Prince George Community Association served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Freeman, Hunter) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

LR 26.01 Answers

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/4/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/18/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/14/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/12/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/12/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/19/2022, Discovery due by 6/13/2022, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 6/27/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for jury selection and/or trial on or after 11/1/2022 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/14/2021. (sshe, ) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Paige Brown on behalf of Prince George Community Association (Brown, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Paige Brown on behalf of Prince George Community Association (Brown, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/4/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/18/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/14/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/12/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/12/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/19/2022, Discovery due by 6/13/2022, Motion in Limine due by 15 business days prior to jury selection, Motions due by 6/27/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to jury selection, Case ready for jury selection and/or trial on or after 11/1/2022 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/14/2021. (sshe, ) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Prince George Community Association. (Attachments: #1 LR 26.01 Answers)(Templeton, Morgan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Panoramic Stock Images LTD. Prince George Community Association served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Freeman, Hunter) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (sshe, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Prince George Community Association. (sshe, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Panoramic Stock Images LTD.(sshe, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Prince George Community Association ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10151169.), filed by Panoramic Stock Images LTD. Service due by 1/26/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Webpage, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters)(sshe, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Paige Brown