This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2022 at 08:21:09 (UTC).

Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd v. Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2022 Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Brookfield Properties USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01765

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd

Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd doing business as Panoramic Images

Defendant

Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Anthony Dunne

Attorney at Sriplaw

175 Pearl St., Ste Floors 1-3

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Defendant Attorney

Nancy Jill Mertzel

Attorney at Mertzel Law PLLC

5 Penn Plaza, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10001

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Registration

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Infringement

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT BLANK FORM - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Dunne, Joseph) Modified on 3/4/2022 (vf). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC. (vf) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#8

(#8) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#9

(#9) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. No later than one week after the conclusion of all mediation in this case, the parties are directed to notify the Court whether they successfully resolved the case in mediation. The Court specifically requests that a mediator with expertise in copyright matters be assigned. To facilitate prompt mediation, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff: to file proof of service no more than three days after service has been effected; and to produce to Defendant(s), by the earlier of 1) 14 days after service of process or 2) three business days in advance of any mediation session, copies of records sufficient to show the royalty paid the last three times the picture that is at issue in this case was licensed, as well as the number of times the picture was licensed in the last five years; if the picture at issue has never been licensed, Plaintiff must expressly certify that fact to Defendant(s) as part of Plaintiffs production. Defendant(s) are directed to file a notice of appearance within 14 days of the service of process.The Court further directs that, upon a Defendants timely filing of a notice of appearance, the deadline for that Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended until 30 days after the conclusion of all Mediation in this case.If Plaintiff has effected service on a Defendant, and that Defendant has failed to appear in the case or respond to the Complaint, Plaintiff must move for a default judgment against that Defendant in accordance with this Courts Individual Practices no later than 45 days after the date of the service of the Complaint. SO ORDERED.The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/17/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/7/2022) (tg) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company, registered agent to Defendant. Document filed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Jill Mertzel on behalf of Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC..(Mertzel, Nancy) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 5/11/2022.(ah) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nancy Jill Mertzel on behalf of Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC..(Mertzel, Nancy) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company, registered agent to Defendant. Document filed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. No later than one week after the conclusion of all mediation in this case, the parties are directed to notify the Court whether they successfully resolved the case in mediation. The Court specifically requests that a mediator with expertise in copyright matters be assigned. To facilitate prompt mediation, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff: to file proof of service no more than three days after service has been effected; and to produce to Defendant(s), by the earlier of 1) 14 days after service of process or 2) three business days in advance of any mediation session, copies of records sufficient to show the royalty paid the last three times the picture that is at issue in this case was licensed, as well as the number of times the picture was licensed in the last five years; if the picture at issue has never been licensed, Plaintiff must expressly certify that fact to Defendant(s) as part of Plaintiffs production. Defendant(s) are directed to file a notice of appearance within 14 days of the service of process.The Court further directs that, upon a Defendants timely filing of a notice of appearance, the deadline for that Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended until 30 days after the conclusion of all Mediation in this case.If Plaintiff has effected service on a Defendant, and that Defendant has failed to appear in the case or respond to the Complaint, Plaintiff must move for a default judgment against that Defendant in accordance with this Courts Individual Practices no later than 45 days after the date of the service of the Complaint. SO ORDERED.The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/17/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/7/2022) (tg) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC. (vf) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joseph Anthony Dunne to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Civil Cover sheet form is Blank. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Anthony Dunne. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (vf) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd..(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT BLANK FORM - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed.(Dunne, Joseph) Modified on 3/4/2022 (vf). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25807682)Document filed by Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters).(Dunne, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brookfield Properties Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Panoramic Stock Images, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy Jill Mertzel