This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/17/2022 at 07:26:52 (UTC).

Panneflek v. Verastegui et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 Panneflek filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Verastegui. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01282

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricardo Panneflek

Defendants

Renzo Verastegui

Renatta Verastegui

Delivery DRD Corp.

New Life Broadcasting, Inc.

Arso Radio Corporation

XYZ Corporation

John Doe

Miami All Network Marketing Inc.

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura Belendez-Ferrero

Attorney at Laura Belendez-Ferrero, Esq/

P.O. Box 11534

San Juan, PR 00922

 

Court Documents

3 #8

Summons

3 #7

Summons

3 #6

Summons

3 #5

Summons

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Category Sheet

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Main Document

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

2 #2

Main Document

1 #13

Exhibit 13-New Life Response

1 #12

Exhibit 12-Cease and Desist NLB

1 #11

Exhibit 11-Google Search

1 #10

Exhibit 10-Response from REV and Miami All Network

1 #7

Exhibit 7-Arso Radio Group Letter

1 #4

Exhibit 4-Office Action

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Defendants Use of Infringing Product

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Case Initiating Documents filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Ricardo Panneflek Responses due by 6/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura) Modified on 6/16/2022 to correct event title (mcm). (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Laura Belendez-Ferrero on behalf of Ricardo Panneflek Responses due by 6/30/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number BPRDC-7799303.), filed by Ricardo Panneflek. Service due by 9/14/2022, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit 2-Samples of Use Collagen 21, #3 Exhibit 3-Defendants Use of Infringing Product, #4 Exhibit 4-Office Action, #5 Exhibit 5-Response to Office Action, #6 Exhibit 6-Types of Collagen, #7 Exhibit 7-Arso Radio Group Letter, #8 Exhibit 8-Response Arso Radio Group, #9 Exhibit 9-Cease and Desist Letter REV and Miami All Network, #10 Exhibit 10-Response from REV and Miami All Network, #11 Exhibit 11-Google Search, #12 Exhibit 12-Cease and Desist NLB, #13 Exhibit 13-New Life Response, #14 Exhibit 14-DRD Cease and Desist)(Belendez-Ferrero, Laura) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant