This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2020 at 09:26:03 (UTC).

Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP v. Tarralbo et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Tarralbo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00751

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP

Defendants

Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC

Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline Inc

Mustang Gas Products LLC

DCP Operating Company LP

Koch Hydrocarbon LP

MIT Okla LLC

Dynegy Midstream LLC

Donna Hoehner

Chisholm Pipeline Company

OneOK Plant Transfer LLC

ConocoPhillips Company

Western Electric Cooperative

Plains Pipeline LP

Rodman Gas Processing LLC

Premier Oklahoma Processors I LLC

Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC

Sea Breeze Communication Company

Todd Ward

20 Acres of Real Estate in Kingfisher County Oklahoma

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

F Jason Goodnight

Attorney at Feldman Franden Woodard & Farris

Two W 2Nd St, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Defendant Attorneys

Jay W Dobson

Attorney at Elias Books Brown & Nelson PC

211 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7114

William K Elias

Attorney at Elias Books Brown Peterson & Massad

211 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7114

Jayne Jarnigan Robertson

Attorney at Jayne Jarnigan Robertson PC

119 N Robinson Ave, Suite 777

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Joseph H Bocock

Attorney at Bocock Law PLLC

119 N Robinson Ave, Suite 630

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

John D Stiner

Attorney at Stiner Law Firm PLLC

119 N Robinson, Suite 630

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Michael J Gibbens

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-TULSA

321 S Boston Ave, Suite 500

Tulsa, OK 74103-3313

Deric J McClellan

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-TULSA

321 S Boston Ave, Suite 500

Tulsa, OK 74103-3313

Other Attorneys

J Dillon Curran

Attorney at Conner & Winters-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, Suite 1700

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

#26

25 #2

Exhibit Order - WBI v Subsurface Easements

25 #1

Exhibit State Court Complaint

#25

11 #1

Exhibit Lease Agreement

#11

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 t- Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STIPULATION of Dismissal OF DEFENDANT PLAINS PIPELINE, L.P. AND DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by All Plaintiffs. (Goodnight, F) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Donna Hoehner, Anita Tarralbo, Todd Ward. (Stiner, John) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plains Pipeline LP answer due 10/1/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/21/2020. (mb) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, #8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Plains Pipeline LP. (Gibbens, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Order - WBI v Subsurface Easements)(Goodnight, F) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan J. Vershay. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/4/2020. (mb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SUPPLEMENT re #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3258656 by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Application for Admission PHV)(Goodnight, F) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3258656 by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Goodnight, F) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint by Logan County Rural Water District #2.(Curran, J) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ENTRY of Appearance by J Dillon Curran on behalf of Logan County Rural Water District #2 (Curran, J) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Plains Pipeline LP Disclosure Statement of Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Gibbens, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Defendant Plains Pipeline, LP's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response or Answer of Plains Pipeline LP due 9/21/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/26/2020. (mb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Deric J McClellan on behalf of Plains Pipeline LP (McClellan, Deric) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Plains Pipeline LP. (Gibbens, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J Gibbens on behalf of Plains Pipeline LP (Gibbens, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP . (Goodnight, F) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by F Jason Goodnight on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Goodnight, F) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3211965. (Goodnight, F) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Chisholm Pipeline Company, DCP Operating Company LP, Dynegy Midstream LLC, Donna Hoehner, Koch Hydrocarbon LP, Logan County Rural Water District #2, MIT Okla LLC, Mustang Gas Products LLC, OneOK Plant Transfer LLC, Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC, Sea Breeze Communication Company, Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline Inc, Anita Tarralbo, Todd Ward, Western Electric Cooperative. (kmt) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 20 Acres of Real Estate in Kingfisher County Oklahoma, Chisholm Pipeline Company, DCP Operating Company LP, Dynegy Midstream LLC, Donna Hoehner, Koch Hydrocarbon LP, Logan County Rural Water District #2, MIT Okla LLC, Mustang Gas Products LLC, OneOK Plant Transfer LLC, Phillips 66 Pipeline LLC, Phillips Texas Pipeline Company Eagle 2 LLC, Plains Pipeline LP, Sea Breeze Communication Company, Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline Inc, Anita Tarralbo, Unknown, Todd Ward, Western Electric Cooperative filed by Panhandle Eastern Pipeline Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 t- Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where DCP Operating Company, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Phillip 66 Pipeline LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Plains Pipeline, L.P. is a litigant