This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:48:08

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Panega against T C Transport, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-CV-03353
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Harry D. Leinenweber
  • Courthouse Illinois Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Jeremy Banister
  • Represented By
    • Jonathan P. Schaefer
    • Dustin James Karrison
  • Defendant T.C. Transport, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Jonathan P. Schaefer
    • Dustin James Karrison
  • Plaintiff Jody Panega
  • Represented By
    • Michael T. Wierzbicki, Jr.
  • Intervenor American Zurich Insurance Company
  • Represented By
    • Meghan Aislinn Rigney

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jeremy Banister, T.C...

Fees Apply
#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Meghan Aislinn Rigney for presentme...

Fees Apply
7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion to Intervene

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) MOTION by Intervenor American Zurich Insurance Company ...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jody Panega by Michae...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) E-MAILED notice of removal letter to Michael Wierzbicki...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jeremy Banister, T.C...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schaefer, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/17/...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (19 L 3...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jeremy Banister, T.C. Transport, Inc. by Dustin James Karrison (Karrison, Dustin) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#8) NOTICE of Motion by Meghan Aislinn Rigney for presentment of motion to intervene #7 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rigney, Meghan) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#7) MOTION by Intervenor American Zurich Insurance Company to intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion to Intervene)(Rigney, Meghan) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 7/18/19 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
  • 05/24/2019
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jody Panega by Michael T. Wierzbicki, Jr (Wierzbicki, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#4) E-MAILED notice of removal letter to Michael Wierzbicki Jr (las, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jeremy Banister, T.C. Transport, Inc. by Jonathan P. Schaefer (Schaefer, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schaefer, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (19 L 3241) filed by Jeremy Banister, T.C. Transport, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840103. (Schaefer, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.