This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 08:03:58 (UTC).

Pandera Systems, LLC v. Traena, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Pandera Systems, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Traena, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00829

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pandera Systems, LLC

Defendants

Dylan Raleigh

Aram Taghavani

Ryan Redmann

Chris Wade

Traena, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher V. Langone

Attorney at Weissberg and Associates, Ltd

564 W. Randolph2Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

Ariel Weissberg

Attorney at Weissberg & Associates, Ltd

Suite 403401 S Lasalle St

Chicago, IL 60605

Rakesh Khanna

Attorney at Weissberg & Associates, Ltd

Suite 403401 S Lasalle St

Chicago, IL 60605

J. Robert McCormack

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Tampa

100 N Tampa St Ste 3600

Tampa, FL 33602-5867

Kevin Douglas Zwetsch

Attorney at Cantrell Zwetsch, P.A.

401 E. Jackson Streetsuite 2340

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Schufreider

233 South Wacker, Suite 6600

Chicago, IL 60606

Matthew F. Prewitt

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 S Wacker Dr.Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Daniel J. Schufreider

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drivesuite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Richard Lee Barrett

Attorney at Barrett, Chapman & Ruta, PA

18 Wall Stpo Box 3826

Orlando, FL 32802-3826

Michael D Educate

Attorney at Barack Ferrazano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg LLP

200 W. Madison Streetsuite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Nicholas Heim Callahan

Attorney at Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg LLP

200 W. Madison Streetsuite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#62

61 #14

Exhibit 14

61 #12

Exhibit 12

61 #11

Exhibit 11

61 #10

Exhibit 10

61 #5

Exhibit 5

61 #4

Exhibit 4

61 #3

Exhibit 3

61 #1

Exhibit 1

#60

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

#6

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Pandera Systems, LLC. (Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dylan Raleigh, Ryan Redmann, Traena, Inc., Chris Wade with Jury Demand. filed by Pandera Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Langone, Christopher) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (LDJ). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Dylan Raleigh, Ryan Redmann, Traena, Inc., Chris Wade. (Prewitt, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dylan Raleigh, Ryan Redmann, Traena, Inc., Chris Wade. Related case(s): Yes (Prewitt, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Pandera Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pandera Systems, LLC for Pandera Systems, LLC.. (Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher V. Langone on behalf of Pandera Systems, LLC. Lead Counsel: Christopher V. Langone (pro hac vice). (Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of change of address by Christopher V. Langone (Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Prewitt, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew F. Prewitt on behalf of Dylan Raleigh, Ryan Redmann, Traena, Inc., Chris Wade. Lead Counsel: Matthew F. Prewitt. (Prewitt, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dylan Raleigh, Ryan Redmann, Traena, Inc., Chris Wade. (Schufreider, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Pandera Systems, LLC. Dylan Raleigh waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Weissberg, Ariel) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Pandera Systems, LLC. Chris Wade waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Weissberg, Ariel) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Dylan Raleigh, Ryan Redmann, Aram Taghavani, Chris Wade. (ng, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pandera Systems, LLC by Christopher V. Langone (Langone, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pandera Systems, LLC by Rakesh Khanna (Khanna, Rakesh) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pandera Systems, LLC by Ariel Weissberg (Weissberg, Ariel) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Weissberg, Ariel) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Pandera Systems, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17240784.(Weissberg, Ariel) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice(jh, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 5/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Robert McCormack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rakesh Khanna

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Douglas Zwetsch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ariel Weissberg