This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2021 at 07:38:04 (UTC).

Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Panda Restaurant Group, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Tyson Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03667

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.

Defendants

Tyson Foods, Inc.

Tyson Chicken, Inc.

Tyson Breeders, Inc.

Tyson Poultry, Inc.

Pilgrim's Pride Corporation

Koch Foods, Inc.

JCG Foods Of Alabama, LLC

JCG Foods Of Georgia, LLC

Koch Meat Co., Inc.

Sanderson Farms, Inc.

Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)

Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)

Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)

House of Raeford Farms, Inc.

Mar-Jac Poultry, Inc.

Perdue Farms, Inc.

Perdue Foods, LLC

Wayne Farms, LLC

Simmons Foods, Inc.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terence H. Campbell

Attorney at Cotsirilos, Tighe, Streicker, Poulos, & Campbell, Ltd.

33 North Dearborn Street, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/22/2021.(ec, ) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 9/21/2021 at 11:00 a.m. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (877) 402-9753 and the access code is 1564342. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. by Terence H. Campbell (Campbell, Terence) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Campbell, Terence) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18441325.(Campbell, Terence) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JCG Foods of Georgia LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Koch Meat Co., Inc. is a litigant