This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2020 at 07:42:16 (UTC).

Palumbo et al v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Palumbo filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. Whelan and William V. Gallo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00433

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. Whelan

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Philip Palumbo

Project M Worldwide L.P.

Defendants

Does 1 throught 75

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Thomas Babbitt

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Road, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92131

Michael A. Klitzke

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbit LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Road, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92131-1100

Defendant Attorney

Derrick Y. Chu

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/01/2020. (djk) (Entered: 05/03/2020)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Chu, Derrick) (jdt). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Setting Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/29/2020.(djk) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) NOTICE AND ORDER (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 5/4/2020 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Additionally, the Court will conduct an attorneys-only telephonic Status Conference before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/27/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM with each party separately. If the case does not settle at the ENE, the parties shall be prepared for an in-person Case Management Conference immediately upon completion of the ENE. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/20/2020. (jdt) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

5 #1

Proof of Service

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Philip Palumbo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Klitzke, Michael) (jdt). (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Klitzke on behalf of Philip Palumbo, Project M Worldwide L.P. (Klitzke, Michael)Attorney Michael A. Klitzke added to party Philip Palumbo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A. Klitzke added to party Project M Worldwide L.P.(pty:pla) (jdt). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Daimler North America Corporation for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (vxc)(dsn) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

1 #3

Proof of Service

1 #2

Demand for Jury Trial

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00005602-CU-BC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 13586141.), filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-433-W-WVG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(vxc) Modified on 3/9/2020 to add Attorney for Defendant, NEF regenerated (sxa) (dsn) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/01/2020. (djk) (Entered: 05/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Chu, Derrick) (jdt). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/29/2020.(djk) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and Plaintiffs (Chu, Derrick) (jdt). (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE AND ORDER (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 5/4/2020 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Additionally, the Court will conduct an attorneys-only telephonic Status Conference before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/27/2020 beginning at 9:00 AM with each party separately. If the case does not settle at the ENE, the parties shall be prepared for an in-person Case Management Conference immediately upon completion of the ENE. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/20/2020. (jdt) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Philip Palumbo. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Klitzke, Michael) (jdt). (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Klitzke on behalf of Philip Palumbo, Project M Worldwide L.P. (Klitzke, Michael)Attorney Michael A. Klitzke added to party Philip Palumbo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A. Klitzke added to party Project M Worldwide L.P.(pty:pla) (jdt). (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (vxc) (dsn) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Daimler North America Corporation for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (vxc)(dsn) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00005602-CU-BC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 13586141.), filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-433-W-WVG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(vxc) Modified on 3/9/2020 to add Attorney for Defendant, NEF regenerated (sxa) (dsn) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Project M Worldwide LP is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derrick Y Chu