This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:12:09 (UTC).

Palomar Modular Buildings LLC v. Pro-Mark Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Palomar Modular Buildings LLC filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Pro-Mark Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Joe Fish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01892

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

A. Joe Fish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Palomar Modular Buildings LLC

Defendants

Western Surety Company

Pro-Mark Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven M Burton

Attorney at Sanderford & Carroll PC

2100 Birdcreek Drive

Temple, TX 76502

Paul H Sanderford

Attorney at Sanderford & Carroll PC

2110 Birdcreek Drive

Temple, TX 76502

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Palomar Modular Buildings LLC. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Western Surety Company ; served on 7/20/2020. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pro-Mark Services Inc ; served on 7/20/2020. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Palomar Modular Buildings LLC. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Pro-Mark Services Inc, Western Surety Company. (mjr) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Pro-Mark Services Inc, Western Surety Company filed by Palomar Modular Buildings LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11004392) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the parties' stipulation (docket entry 8), the defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint is hereby extended until September 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/3/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Palomar Modular Buildings LLC. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Western Surety Company ; served on 7/20/2020. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pro-Mark Services Inc ; served on 7/20/2020. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Palomar Modular Buildings LLC. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC ORDER: On July 17, 2020, the plaintiff filed a complaint in this case but did not provide the clerk with a certificate of interested persons. N.D. TEX. CIV. R. 3.1(c) and 3.2(e) requires that "[w]hen a complaint is filed, the plaintiff must provide the clerk with... a separately signed certificate of interested persons that contains a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities who or which are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, no later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 7/20/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Pro-Mark Services Inc, Western Surety Company. (mjr) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Pro-Mark Services Inc, Western Surety Company filed by Palomar Modular Buildings LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11004392) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sanderford, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less