This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 07:01:16 (UTC).

Palo Alto Networks, Inc. v. Packet Intelligence LLC

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Palo Alto Networks, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Packet Intelligence LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02471

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Palo Alto Networks, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Packet Intelligence LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Mark Daniel Rowland

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

James R. Batchelder

Attorney at Ropes and Gray

1900 University Avenue, 6Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Andrew Townsend Radsch

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1900 University Ave, Sixth Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303-2284

Andrew Radsch

Attorney at Ropes and Gray LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Brian A. E. Smith

Attorney at Bartko Zankel Bunzel & Miller

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

18 #5

Exhibit E

18 #4

Exhibit D

18 #3

Exhibit C

18 #2

Exhibit B

18 #1

Exhibit A

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Palo Alto Networks, Inc. byPacket Intelligence LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Smith, Brian) (Filed on 7/2/2019) Modified on 7/3/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Packet Intelligence LLC to File Its Responsive Pleading filed by Palo Alto Networks, Inc.. (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#16

(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Packet Intelligence LLC to File Its Responsive Pleading filed by Palo Alto Networks, Inc.. (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/29/2019) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Palo Alto Networks, Inc. of Case Management Conference Order and Standing Orders (Radsch, Andrew) (Filed on 5/22/2019) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/15/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Palo Alto Networks, Inc.. Palo Alto Networks, Inc. served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/14/2019) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Judge Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Palo Alto Networks, Inc... (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/10/2019) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Radsch on behalf of Plaintiff Palo Alto Networks, Inc. (Radsch, Andrew) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Daniel Rowland on behalf of Plaintiff Palo Alto Networks, Inc. (Rowland, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement against Packet Intelligence LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13325104.). Filed byPalo Alto Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/7/2019) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Palo Alto Networks, Inc. byPacket Intelligence LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Smith, Brian) (Filed on 7/2/2019) Modified on 7/3/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Packet Intelligence LLC to File Its Responsive Pleading filed by Palo Alto Networks, Inc.. (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 6/18/2019) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Packet Intelligence LLC to File Its Responsive Pleading filed by Palo Alto Networks, Inc.. (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/29/2019) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Palo Alto Networks, Inc. of Case Management Conference Order and Standing Orders (Radsch, Andrew) (Filed on 5/22/2019) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/15/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Palo Alto Networks, Inc.. Palo Alto Networks, Inc. served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/14/2019) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Judge Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • (#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Palo Alto Networks, Inc... (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/10/2019) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Radsch on behalf of Plaintiff Palo Alto Networks, Inc. (Radsch, Andrew) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Daniel Rowland on behalf of Plaintiff Palo Alto Networks, Inc. (Rowland, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Packet Intelligence LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Palo Alto Networks, Inc. (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/7/2019) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/21/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/7/2019) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/7/2019) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement against Packet Intelligence LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13325104.). Filed byPalo Alto Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Batchelder, James) (Filed on 5/7/2019) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Packet Intelligence LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PALO ALTO NETWORKS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Townsend Radsch