This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 08:04:39 (UTC).

Palmer v. Renaissance Hotel Operating Company

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Palmer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Renaissance Hotel Operating Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is James R. Nowlin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00914

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Nowlin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ivonne Palmer

Defendant

Renaissance Hotel Operating Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neil Patrick Solomon

Attorney at Zinda Law Group, PLLC

8834 N. Capital Of Texas Highway, Suite 304

Austin, TX 78759

Elecia Byrd

Attorney at Zinda Law Group, PLLC

8834 North Capital Of Texas Highway, Suite 304

Austin, TX 78759

Defendant Attorney

Jacqueline Montejano

Attorney at Montejano Law Firm, PLLC

3131 Mckinney Ave., Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75204

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (so) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

5 #1

Motion for Admittance Pro Hac Vice

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elecia Byrd ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12624418) by on behalf of Ivonne Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Admittance Pro Hac Vice)(Solomon, Neil) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Directing Elecia Byrd to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Renaissance Hotel Operating Company. (Montejano, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #10

Exhibit Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Renaissance Hotel Operating

1 #9

Exhibit Corres. from Neil Solomon to Jacqueline Montejano, serving Plaintiffs Fi

1 #8

Exhibit Plaintiffs Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Against IA Lodging Austin

1 #7

Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

1 #6

Exhibit Return of Service (IA Lodging Austin Arboretum, LP)

1 #5

Exhibit Issuance of Citation (IA Lodging Austin Arboretum, LP)

1 #4

Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Appendix Index of Documents Being Filed

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Renaissance Hotel Operating Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12616314), filed by Renaissance Hotel Operating Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Documents Being Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #5 Exhibit Issuance of Citation (IA Lodging Austin Arboretum, LP), #6 Exhibit Return of Service (IA Lodging Austin Arboretum, LP), #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, #8 Exhibit Plaintiffs Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Against IA Lodging Austin Arboretum, LP d/b/a Renaissance Austin Hotel, #9 Exhibit Corres. from Neil Solomon to Jacqueline Montejano, serving Plaintiffs First Amended Petition and Notice of Nonsuit, #10 Exhibit Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, #11 Exhibit Renaissance Hotel Operating Companys Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #12 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party of Removal)(Montejano, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (so) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elecia Byrd ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12624418) by on behalf of Ivonne Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Admittance Pro Hac Vice)(Solomon, Neil) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Directing Elecia Byrd to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Renaissance Hotel Operating Company. (cj) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Renaissance Hotel Operating Company. (Montejano, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Renaissance Hotel Operating Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12616314), filed by Renaissance Hotel Operating Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Documents Being Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #5 Exhibit Issuance of Citation (IA Lodging Austin Arboretum, LP), #6 Exhibit Return of Service (IA Lodging Austin Arboretum, LP), #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, #8 Exhibit Plaintiffs Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Against IA Lodging Austin Arboretum, LP d/b/a Renaissance Austin Hotel, #9 Exhibit Corres. from Neil Solomon to Jacqueline Montejano, serving Plaintiffs First Amended Petition and Notice of Nonsuit, #10 Exhibit Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, #11 Exhibit Renaissance Hotel Operating Companys Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #12 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party of Removal)(Montejano, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Renaissance Hotel Operating Co. is a litigant