This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2022 at 07:36:59 (UTC).

PALMER v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 PALMER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03415

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEVIN PALMER

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE

PROGRESSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN D. ROSENAU

Attorney at Schatz & Steinberg, P.C.

1500 Jfk Blvd Suite 1300

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN

Attorney at FORRY ULLMAN

661 Moore Road, Suite 202

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

DANIEL J. TWILLA

Attorney at BURNS WHITE LLC

48 26Th Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

KATHLEEN PATRICIA DAPPER

Attorney at Burns White LLC

48 26Th Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Case Management Track Form

1 #6

Designation Form

1 #7

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., The Progressive Corporation by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE AKA PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO AKA PROGRESSIVE.(DAPPER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(FRIEDMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE.(DAPPER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/6/2022. 9/6/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE. (DAPPER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/15/2022. 9/15/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/15/2022. 9/15/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE. (DAPPER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/6/2022. 9/6/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE.(DAPPER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(FRIEDMAN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., The Progressive Corporation by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE AKA PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO AKA PROGRESSIVE.(DAPPER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE AKA PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO AKA PROGRESSIVE (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16132246), filed by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE AKA PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO AKA PROGRESSIVE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Case Management Track Form, #6 Designation Form, #7 Certificate of Service)(TWILLA, DANIEL) (Attachment 6 replaced on 8/25/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN D. ROSENAU