This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:46:34 (UTC).

Palmer v. Ohio Bell Telephone Company, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Palmer filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ohio Bell Telephone Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Solomon Oliver, Jr and Christopher A. Boyko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01125

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Solomon Oliver, Jr

Christopher A. Boyko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Palmer

Defendants

Ohio Bell Telephone Company

Pete Sekret

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tina M. Scibona

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm - Cleveland

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Christopher P. Wido

Attorney at Spitz Law Firm - Cleveland

25200 Chagrin Blvd.

Beachwood, OH 44122

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Ryder Wentz

Attorney at Littler Mendelson - Cleveland

20Th Floor, 1100 Superior Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Christian D. McFarland

Attorney at Littler Mendelson - Cleveland

20Th Floor, 1100 Superior Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Pete Sekret. Service attempted by Certified on 6/10/2019 filed on behalf of Charles Palmer Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Pete Sekret. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

(#3) Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/28/2019. (R,Sh) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Other Affiliate AT&T Inc. for Ohio Bell Telephone Company filed by Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ohio Bell Telephone Company on 5/30/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Charles Palmer Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (W,CM) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

1 #2

Summons Summons x 3

#1

(#1) Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9315387. Filed by Charles Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons x 3) (Scibona, Tina) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon CT Corporation Statutory Agent, on 5/30/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website filed on behalf of Charles Palmer Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (W,CM) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 22, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Defendant Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Pete Sekret. Service attempted by Certified on 6/10/2019 filed on behalf of Charles Palmer Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Other Affiliate AT&T Inc. for Ohio Bell Telephone Company filed by Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #6 Motion for extension of time until 7/22/2019 to Answer. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/12/2019.(H,CM) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Notice by Clerk that Ohio Bell Telephone Company failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,Ja) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 22, 2019 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Defendant Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Wentz, Amy) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon CT Corporation Statutory Agent, on 5/30/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website filed on behalf of Charles Palmer Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (W,CM) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ohio Bell Telephone Company on 5/30/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Charles Palmer Related document(s) #2 , #1 . (W,CM) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (Y,A) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/28/2019. (R,Sh) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Ohio Bell Telephone Company (Receipt # 70180040000079033011), CT Corporation Statutory Agent (Receipt # 70180040000079032977), and Pete Sekret (Receipt # 70180040000079032960) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (S,KM) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Pete Sekret. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9315387. Filed by Charles Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons x 3) (Scibona, Tina) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.