This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2020 at 11:53:58 (UTC).

Palmer v. Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Palmer filed an Other lawsuit against Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Juan M. Perez-Gimenez and Gustavo A. Gelpi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01087

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Juan M. Perez-Gimenez

Gustavo A. Gelpi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samantha Palmer

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Universidad del Sagrado Corazon

Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Paul Gertz

Attorney at Gertz Adair Law Firm

2630 Liberty

Beaumont, TX 77702

Shawn Jaffer

Attorney at Shawn Jaffer Law Firm PLLC - Frisco

9300 John Hickman Pkwy, Suite 1204

Frisco, TX 75035

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Michael Acevedo-Carlson

Attorney at The Gonzalez Law Group PLLC - Houston

8876 Gulf Freeway, Suite 420

Houston, TX 77017

Anthony W Hernandez

Attorney at Anthony W Hernandez, Attorney at Law

15200 Middlebrook Drive, Suite A

Houston, TX 77058

Miguel Simonet-Sierra

Attorney at Monserratre Simonet & Gierbolini

101 Ave. San Patricio, Suite 1120

Guaynabo, PR 00968

 

Court Documents

43 #5

6

43 #4

5

43 #3

4

43 #2

3

43 #1

2

#43

(#43) STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Universidad del Sagrado Corazon (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

39 #1

*Restricted*

#39

(#39) Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00341. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/18/2020)

31 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Idalia Llorens Collections Agency Inc.( Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Universidad del Sagrado Corazon served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) Modified on 8/12/2019 (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Universidad del Sagrado Corazon served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) ***FILED IN ERROR. SUMMONS NOT FLATTENED.*** [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc, Universidad del Sagrado Corazon and emailed to plaintiff's atty for service. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7380210.), filed by Samantha Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docket(#42) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (Docket No. 41), this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi. Signed by Clerk on 02/27/2020. (gr) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docket(#41) ORDER. Upon taking senior status, the undersigned does not preside over Consumer Credit cases. The Clerk was so notified via memo in 2013. After a perfunctory review of the complaint, the undersigned finds that this is such a case. Therefore, the Clerk of Court shall take note of this order and randomly reassign this case to another Judge. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 2/27/2020. (RIF) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Miguel Simonet-Sierra on behalf of Universidad del Sagrado Corazon (Simonet-Sierra, Miguel) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00341. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDERED that the Universitys motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and failure to state a claim for relief or alternatively transfer venue [Dkt. 22] is GRANTED IN PART and the case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico in its entirety with the two pending motions [Dkt. 21; 33]. Ordered that Ms Palmer's #31 Motion to change venue to the Sherman Division is denied. Ordered that the University's #35 motion for a hearing is moot and the hearing #37 is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/21/2020. (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 36, notice to the court. Proposed orders are not filed as a separate document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Motions Hearing set for 1/22/2020 03:00 PM in Ctrm 1 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (fal, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting #35 Motion for Hearing. Court ORDERED that the parties appear before this Court on January 22,2020, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom #1, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont,Texas, for a hearing on whether the Court has personal jurisdiction over the University, whethervenue is proper, and where the Universitys corporate representative should be deposed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery and all pre-trial deadlines are stayed until after the hearing. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/15/20. (fal, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** NOTICE by Universidad del Sagrado Corazon (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(Acevedo-Carlson, Kevin) Modified on 1/16/2020 (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc to 9/13/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Idalia Llorens Collections Agency Inc.( Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Universidad del Sagrado Corazon served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) Modified on 8/12/2019 (bjc, ). [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samantha Palmer. Universidad del Sagrado Corazon served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn) ***FILED IN ERROR. SUMMONS NOT FLATTENED.*** [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Idalia Llorens Collection Agency, Inc, Universidad del Sagrado Corazon and emailed to plaintiff's atty for service. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Samantha Palmer. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (aam, ) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7380210.), filed by Samantha Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Jaffer, Shawn) [Transferred from txed on 2/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less