This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:03:45 (UTC).

Palacios et al v. Oasis Catering, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Palacios filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Oasis Catering, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Vera M. Scanlon and Eric N. Vitaliano. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06871

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marta Nicolasa Palacios

Yorman Anibar Rabanales

Defendants

Scott Fagan

Oasis Catering, Inc.

Oasis Catering, Inc. doing business as Traditions Eatery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roman M. Avshalumov

Attorney at Helen F. Dalton & Associates, P.C.

80-02 Kew Gardens Road, Suite 601

Kew Gardens, NY 11415

James Patrick Peter O'Donnell

80-02 Kew Gardens Road, Suite 601

Kew Gardens, NY 11415

Defendant Attorney

Ira A. Sturm

Attorney at Raab Sturm & Ganchrow, LLP

2125 Center Avenue, Suite 100

Fort Lee, NJ 07024

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Scott Fagan, Oasis Catering, Inc.. (Sturm, Ira) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales. Scott Fagan waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/17/2020; Oasis Catering, Inc. waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (O'Donnell, James) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Scott Fagan, Oasis Catering, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales (aty to be noticed) (O'Donnell, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales (Avshalumov, Roman) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales (Avshalumov, Roman) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Scott Fagan, Oasis Catering, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12131974 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales. (Avshalumov, Roman) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Scott Fagan, Oasis Catering, Inc.. (Sturm, Ira) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales. Scott Fagan waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/17/2020; Oasis Catering, Inc. waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/17/2020. (O'Donnell, James) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Scott Fagan, Oasis Catering, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales (aty to be noticed) (O'Donnell, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales (Avshalumov, Roman) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales (Avshalumov, Roman) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Scott Fagan, Oasis Catering, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12131974 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Marta Nicolasa Palacios, Yorman Anibar Rabanales. (Avshalumov, Roman) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less