This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 07:52:00 (UTC).

Palacio v. Merchants' Credit Guide Co.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Palacio filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Merchants' Credit Guide Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03155

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nisha Palacio

Defendant

Merchants' Credit Guide Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P Carlin

Attorney at Suburban Legal Group

1305 Remington Road, Suite C

Schaumburg, IL 60173

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Ruddy S-A. Abam

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson Llp

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the voluntary dismissal #5 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Any hearing dates before this Court are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nisha Palacio (Carlin, John) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants' Credit Guide Co. by Ruddy S-A. Abam (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants' Credit Guide Co. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nisha Palacio by John P Carlin (Carlin, John) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nisha Palacio; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18345002. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Carlin, John) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Pursuant to the voluntary dismissal #5 , this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Any hearing dates before this Court are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nisha Palacio (Carlin, John) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants' Credit Guide Co. by Ruddy S-A. Abam (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants' Credit Guide Co. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Merchants' Credit Guide Co. (crl, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nisha Palacio by John P Carlin (Carlin, John) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nisha Palacio; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18345002. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Carlin, John) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Credit Guide Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P Carlin