This case was last updated from PACER on 03/03/2020 at 08:26:01 (UTC).

Pal v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 Pal filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against United States Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H L Perez-Montes and Dee D Drell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph H L Perez-Montes

Presiding Judge

Dee D Drell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karan Pal

Defendants

Matthew T Albence

U S Dept of Homeland Security

U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement

William Barr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Frick

Attorney at Law Office of William Frick

701 Millennium Tower, 719 Second Avenue

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Louisiana at Alexandria by electronic case transfer. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to all counsel of record and to alert the Western District of Louisiana about the pending motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#10

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of William Frick for Karan Pal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/31/2020. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ELECTRONIC ORDER mooting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/26/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations by Karan Pal. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY filed as this document was electronically filed in error as 18 RESPONSE (NOT Motions). Response to Objection to R&R due by 3/2/2020 (crt,Haik, K) Modified to add document number on 2/19/2020 (Haik, K). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendations by Karan Pal. (aty,Frick, William) Modified to more accurately describe pleading on 2/19/2020 (Haik, K). (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to Respond to Report and Recommendation with consent sought but not yet obtained by Karan Pal. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Frick, William) Modified event type on 2/13/2020 (Chicola, C). (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of William Frick for Karan Pal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/31/2020. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for William G Frick to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Request to Waive Local Counsel Requirement by Karan Pal (Filing fee of $105.00 paid; Receipt No.: 14635003101). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Copy of Petition for Admission, #3 Request to Waive Local Counsel Requirement, #4 Proposed Order)(crt,Williams, L) Modified on 1/31/2020 to change file date (Williams, L). Modified on 1/31/2020 to edit text (Williams, L). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Deficiency to William Frick on behalf of Karan Pal regarding #13 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Waive Requirements for Local Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2.7. Reason: (1) The above item requires a certificate of good standing. Please refer to LR83.2.6 for more specific requirements. (2) LR83.2.6 requires that visiting attorneys shall pay a $105.00 fee to the clerk of court. (3) An original signature of an attorney or a party is required by Fed.R.Civ.P.11. If filed in paper, a photocopy, signature stamp, FAX copy of a signature or signature "by permission" is not deemed by the judges of this district to fulfill the requirements of this rule. Please provide a proper signature page for this document. (4) Either no proposed order accompanied this motion, or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (5)Document was not submitted in accordance with this court's regular procedures. (crt,Williams, L) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFICIENT MOTION to Waive Requirements for Local Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2.7 by Karan Pal. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Haik, K) Modified on 1/31/2020 to remove "?" from docket text - see doc #15 Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice.(Williams, L). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Karan Pal. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Pals case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes (a) on 1/7/2020. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WITHDRAWN FILED IN ERROR - REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Karan Pal, filed by Karan Pal. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Pals case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes (a) on 1/7/2020. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to reflect withdraw filed in error on 1/8/2020 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-02092. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Louisiana at Alexandria by electronic case transfer. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to all counsel of record and to alert the Western District of Louisiana about the pending motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of William Frick re #4 Minute Order, by Petitioner Karan Pal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Online Detainee Locator Information)(Frick, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Supplemental BRIEF re #4 Minute Order, by Petitioner Karan Pal (Frick, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions.Corrected signature page must be filed by 1/14/2020. (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly DEFERRING ruling on petitioner's motion for temporary restraining order, docket no. #2 , pending the filing of a supplemental brief and supporting declaration. See Minute Order for further details. (KK) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Judge Marsha J. Pechman and Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SG) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Karan Pal. (SG) Modified on 12/27/2019 Motion documents regenerated to AUSA(SG). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/31/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 0981-6065964), filed by Karan Pal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Supplement Motion For Emergeny TRO (see dkt #2 ), # (3) Proposed Order) (see dkt #2 )(Frick, William) Modified on 12/27/2019 documents regenerated to AUSA (SG). Modified on 12/31/2019 (proposed order attached at #2 )(KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/3/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.