This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:59:05 (UTC).

Paige v. State of North Carolina

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Paige filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of North Carolina. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-HC-02005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Akeem X. Paige

Maury, NC 28554

Respondent

State of North Carolina

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Documents in Support

4 #2

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) PETITION (in letter form) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Akeem X. Paige. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

#4

(#4) PETITION (CORRECTED) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Akeem X. Paige. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Akeem X. Paige at Eastern Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

4 #3

Envelope

1 #1

Documents in Support

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Akeem X. Paige. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#7

(#7) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED from NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER of deficiency - (1) The petition is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court. (2) The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 1/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/7/2020. Copy to petitioner, along with forms. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCase Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for preliminary review. As soon as review is completed by the court, an order will enter and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Docket sheet mailed to petitioner.) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED from NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Akeem X. Paige (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Akeem X. Paige. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION (CORRECTED) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Akeem X. Paige. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER of deficiency - (1) The petition is not on the forms prescribed for use by this court. (2) The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 1/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 1/7/2020. Copy to petitioner, along with forms. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Akeem X. Paige at Eastern Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION (in letter form) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Akeem X. Paige. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.