This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:58:31 (UTC).

Paige v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Paige filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00190

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tamekia Paige

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Holloway, Sr

Attorney at Jonathan Holloway PLC

8550 United Plaza Blvd., Suite 702

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Defendant Attorneys

Adam P. Massey

Attorney at King, Krebs & Jurgens, P.L.L.C.

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170

Chelsea Coleman Crews

Attorney at King & Jurgens LLC

201 St Charles Avenue, 45Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) UNIFORM PRETRIAL NOTICE: The parties are hereby advised of the requirements stated herein for the submission of the Pretrial Order due on 10/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/30/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 6/6/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 6/3/2019. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 2/3/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 3/16/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 3/2/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 4/30/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 5/29/2020. Motions shall be filed by 6/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 11/24/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 12/18/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 12/28/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 - 1/15/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/30/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER of Reference: The foregoing matter is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge for the conduct of all further proceedings and the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and the foregoing consent of the parties. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/29/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#8

(#8) CONSENT to Proceed before US Magistrate by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#7

(#7) Joint STATUS REPORT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 5/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/17/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Supplemental and Amending Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Massey, Adam) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Massey, Adam) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Compliance by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to #1 Notice of Removal, (Massey, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

1 #7

Certificate of Compliance

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1-B

1 #2

Exhibit 1-A

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 676362. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1921352), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Compliance)(Massey, Adam) Modified on 4/2/2019 to flatten cover sheet(SWE). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) UNIFORM PRETRIAL NOTICE: The parties are hereby advised of the requirements stated herein for the submission of the Pretrial Order due on 10/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/30/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 6/6/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 6/3/2019. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 2/3/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 3/16/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 3/2/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 4/30/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 5/29/2020. Motions shall be filed by 6/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 11/24/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 12/18/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 12/28/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 - 1/15/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/30/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER of Reference: The foregoing matter is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge for the conduct of all further proceedings and the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and the foregoing consent of the parties. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/29/2019. (KAH) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT to Proceed before US Magistrate by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint STATUS REPORT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Crews, Chelsea) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 5/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/17/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Supplemental and Amending Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Massey, Adam) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Massey, Adam) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Compliance by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to #1 Notice of Removal, (Massey, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 676362. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1921352), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Compliance)(Massey, Adam) Modified on 4/2/2019 to flatten cover sheet(SWE). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less