This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 at 07:52:51 (UTC).

Pai v. County of Hawaii

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 Pai filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Hawaii. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROM TRADER and JILL A. OTAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00440

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

Presiding Judge

JILL A. OTAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai

Keawe Bradley Dean Mahina Pai

Defendants

Doe Corporations 2-10

County of Hawaii

John Doe 2

Jane Does 1-10

Doe Governmental Entities 1-10

John Does 3-10

John Doe 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter C. Hsieh

841 Bishop Street, Suite 2201

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael Jay Green

841 Bishop Street, Suite 2201, 521-3336

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorneys

Laureen L. Martin

Attorney at Office of the Corporation Counsel-Hawaii

101 Aupuni Street, Ste 325

Hilo, HI 96720

Roland J. Talon

Attorney at Office of the Corporation Counsel-Hawaii

101 Aupuni Street, Ste 325

Hilo, HI 96720

 

Court Documents

5 #2

AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai. County of Hawaii served on 8/20/2019 . (Hsieh, Peter) Modified on 8/26/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to County of Hawaii. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT , DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, (Proposed) SUMMONS against County of Hawaii ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2247155.), filed by Keawe D. M. Pai Keawe Bradley Dean Mahina Pai and Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hsieh, Peter) Docket text modified on 8/13/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#5

(#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

5 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

10 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by County of Hawaii.(Talon, Roland) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of County of Hawaii on behalf of County of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Laureen) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of County of Hawaii on behalf of County of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Laureen) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • (#9) EO: Roland Talon is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/19 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by County of Hawaii.(Talon, Roland) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai. County of Hawaii served on 8/20/2019 . (Hsieh, Peter) Modified on 8/26/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • (#6) EO: The Court RESCHEDULES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/19 @ 9:00 AM to 10/29/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/22/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, ) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to County of Hawaii. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00440 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT , DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, (Proposed) SUMMONS against County of Hawaii ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2247155.), filed by Keawe D. M. Pai Keawe Bradley Dean Mahina Pai and Kaheana Kathleen Kawale Pai . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hsieh, Peter) Docket text modified on 8/13/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.