This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2022 at 11:10:37 (UTC).

Paguada v. Habermaass Corporation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Paguada filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Habermaass Corporation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01091

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josue Paguada

Defendant

Habermaass Corporation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Y. Kroub

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Defendant Attorney

Amanda L Van Hoose Garofalo

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Habermaass Corporation, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25704706)Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Habermaass Corporation, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Habermaass Corporation, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Habermaass Corporation, Inc. served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022. Service was accepted by Jennifer Shaw, Intake Clerk. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#6

(#6) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo dated March 18, 2022. Document filed by Habermaass Corporation, Inc...(Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/21/22) (yv) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#8

(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo dated April 15, 2022. Document filed by Habermaass Corporation, Inc...(Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court is in receipt of a letter filed by Defendant informing the Court that the parties have reached a settlement in principle [ECF No. 8]. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the parties are unable to memorialize their settlement in writing and as long as the application to restore the action is made by May 20, 2022. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 5/20/2022.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/19/2022) (tg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Habermaass Corporation, Inc.. Document filed by Josue Paguada. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Habermaass Corporation, Inc.. Document filed by Josue Paguada. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court is in receipt of a letter filed by Defendant informing the Court that the parties have reached a settlement in principle [ECF No. 8]. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the parties are unable to memorialize their settlement in writing and as long as the application to restore the action is made by May 20, 2022. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 5/20/2022.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/19/2022) (tg) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo dated April 15, 2022. Document filed by Habermaass Corporation, Inc...(Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Habermaass Corporation, Inc. answer due 4/18/2022. (yv) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/21/22) (yv) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo dated March 18, 2022. Document filed by Habermaass Corporation, Inc...(Van Hoose Garofalo, Amanda) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Habermaass Corporation, Inc. served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022. Service was accepted by Jennifer Shaw, Intake Clerk. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Habermaass Corporation, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Habermaass Corporation, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Habermaass Corporation, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25704706)Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda L Van Hoose Garofalo