This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2022 at 07:28:23 (UTC).

Paguada v. BestNest Inc

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Paguada filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against BestNest Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alison J. Nathan and Sarah L Cave. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00838

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

Referral Judge

Sarah L Cave

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josue Paguada

Defendant

BestNest Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Y. Kroub

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Jarrett Scott Charo

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street, Ste 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

William Downes

Attorney at Mizrahi Kroub LLP

200 Vesey Street, Ste 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10281

Defendant Attorneys

Russell S Sayre

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Spencer Shields Cowan

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Barbara M. Maisto

Attorney at Bond Schoeneck & King PLLC

1010 Franklin Avenue, Suite 200

Garden City, NY 11530-2900

Brian J. Butler

Attorney at Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC (Syracuse)

One Lincoln Center

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MEMO ENDORSEMENT #17 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from William J. Downes dated 03/28/2022 re: Intent to File Amended Complaint; denying as moot without prejudice to renewal #13 Motion to Dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request (ECF No. 17) for leave to file an Amended Complaint by April 18, 2022 is GRANTED. In light of the forthcoming amended pleading, Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 13) is DENIED as moot and without prejudice to re-filing after the Amended Complaint is served. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/29/2022) (tg) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#17

(#17) LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from William J. Downes dated 03/28/2022 re: Intent to File Amended Complaint. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Downes, William) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#16

(#16) AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) Particular Motion: Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 13). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. Motions referred to Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/21/2022) (mml) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barbara M. Maisto on behalf of BestNest Inc..(Maisto, Barbara) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by BestNest Inc..(Butler, Brian) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by BestNest Inc..(Butler, Brian) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J. Butler on behalf of BestNest Inc..(Butler, Brian) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

6 #3

Text of Proposed Order

6 #2

Certificates of Good Standing

6 #1

Declaration of Spencer S. Cowan

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/15/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BestNest Inc..(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BestNest Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#1

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BestNest Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/18/2022. (tg) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMO ENDORSEMENT #17 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from William J. Downes dated 03/28/2022 re: Intent to File Amended Complaint; denying as moot without prejudice to renewal #13 Motion to Dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request (ECF No. 17) for leave to file an Amended Complaint by April 18, 2022 is GRANTED. In light of the forthcoming amended pleading, Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 13) is DENIED as moot and without prejudice to re-filing after the Amended Complaint is served. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 3/29/2022) (tg) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from William J. Downes dated 03/28/2022 re: Intent to File Amended Complaint. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Downes, William) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) Particular Motion: Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 13). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. Motions referred to Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/21/2022) (mml) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barbara M. Maisto on behalf of BestNest Inc..(Maisto, Barbara) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. . Document filed by BestNest Inc..(Butler, Brian) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by BestNest Inc..(Butler, Brian) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian J. Butler on behalf of BestNest Inc..(Butler, Brian) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Russell S. Sayre to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Spencer S. Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Russell S. Sayre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25760648. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BestNest Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell S. Sayre, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Sayre, Russell) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Spencer S. Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25760503. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BestNest Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer S. Cowan, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Cowan, Spencer) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/15/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BestNest Inc..(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BestNest Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BestNest Inc. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25661777)Document filed by Josue Paguada..(Kroub, Edward) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spencer S Cowan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Stanfield Sayre

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Joseph Butler