This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2021 at 10:23:53 (UTC).

Paguada v. Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Paguada filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10242

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dilenia Paguada

Defendant

Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mars Khaimov

10826 64Th Avenue, Ste 2Nd Floor

Forest Hills, NY 11375

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer E. Sherven

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

135 Crossways Park Drive, Suite 201

Woodbury, NY 11797

Taylor Michelle Ferris

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

135 Crossways Park Drive, Suite 201

Woodbury, NY 11797

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. This application is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended nunc pro tunc to March 6, 2021. Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC answer due 3/6/2021 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/21/2021) (jca) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#9

(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jennifer E. Sherven dated January 20, 2021. Document filed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC..(Sherven, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer E. Sherven on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC..(Sherven, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taylor Michelle Ferris on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC..(Ferris, Taylor) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Agent. Document filed by Dilenia Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield, to be held telephonically in accordance with the instructions on the first page of this order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/6/2021) (ks) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC..(pc) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dilenia Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22889469)Document filed by Dilenia Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. This application is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended nunc pro tunc to March 6, 2021. Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC answer due 3/6/2021 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/21/2021) (jca) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jennifer E. Sherven dated January 20, 2021. Document filed by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC..(Sherven, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer E. Sherven on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC..(Sherven, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taylor Michelle Ferris on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC..(Ferris, Taylor) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Agent. Document filed by Dilenia Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield, to be held telephonically in accordance with the instructions on the first page of this order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/6/2021) (ks) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC..(pc) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dilenia Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22889469)Document filed by Dilenia Paguada..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BABY BREZZA ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mars Khaimov