This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 10:02:34 (UTC).

Page v. McBee et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Page filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against McBee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ann L. Aiken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01619

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann L. Aiken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vencen Emerald Page

Pendleton, OR 97801-9699

Defendants

Dr. Beaver

Dr. John McBee

Dr. Astorga

Eastern Oregon Correctional Institution

Dr. Beamer

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 is GRANTED. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted above. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to file an amended complaint shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 10/20/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/20/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/17/2020.) (joha) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Vencen Emerald Page against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#1

(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Vencen Emerald Page. (joha) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 is GRANTED. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted above. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to file an amended complaint shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 10/20/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/20/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/17/2020.) (joha) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Vencen Emerald Page against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Vencen Emerald Page. (joha) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less