This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 08:21:00 (UTC).

Page v. Commissioner Of Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Page filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner Of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04435

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dina Elizabeth Page

Defendant

Commissioner Of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa A Palmer

250 South Clinton Street, Suite 210

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

1 #3

summons

1 #1

*Restricted*

1 #2

summons

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

1 #4

summons

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security filed by Dina Elizabeth Page. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (jguajardo, 4). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN of Service Executed as to U S Attorney General on Summons re: 12/1/2019, filed.(sguevara, 4) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Dina Elizabeth Page, filed.(bwhite, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel served on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020, filed.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) USM-285 RETURN of Service Executed as to US Attorney Office - Houston on 11/19/19 re: Summons, filed.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, US Attorney General, and US Attorney's Office -Houston. Issued summons delivered to the Unites States Marshal's Office by USM 285 Form., filed.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security filed by Dina Elizabeth Page. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (jguajardo, 4). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.