This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 07:49:23 (UTC).

Page v. Alltran Financial LP

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Page filed an Other lawsuit against Alltran Financial LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Staci G Cornelius and Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Staci G Cornelius

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Page

Defendant

Alltran Financial LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John G Watts

Attorney at WATTS AND HERRING LLC

301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

M Stan Herring, Jr

Attorney at WATTS & HERRING LLC

301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorney

Laura Catherine Nettles

Attorney at LLOYD, GRAY, WHITEHEAD & MONROE, PC

880 Montclair Road, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alltran Financial LP from District Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-DV-2021-905271.00., filed by Alltran Financial LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AKD) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Alltran Financial LP Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alltran Financial LP. filed by Alltran Financial LP (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Alltran Financial LP.(Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 2/28/22. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 2/28/22. A telephone status conference is hereby set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 A.M.. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/19/2022. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/19/2022. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:22 CV 16 MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (AKD) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#10

(#10) HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/2/2022. (KEK) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/2/2022. (KEK) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Madeline Hughes Haikala. Please use case number 2:22 CV 16 MHH on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (AKD) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2022. (BST, ) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE to remind parties of consent telephone conference scheduled for 11:00 AM tomorrow, 2/15/2022; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be cancelled. (BST, ) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/19/2022. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 2/28/22. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 2/28/22. A telephone status conference is hereby set for 2/15/2022 at 11:00 A.M.. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/19/2022. (BST, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3995014 (ALND receipt# B4601117973). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alltran Financial LP from District Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-DV-2021-905271.00., filed by Alltran Financial LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(AKD). (Nettles, Laura) Modified on 1/14/2022 (AKD). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Alltran Financial LP.(Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alltran Financial LP. filed by Alltran Financial LP (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Alltran Financial LP Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Nettles, Laura) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD ) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alltran Financial LP from District Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-DV-2021-905271.00., filed by Alltran Financial LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AKD) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura C. Nettles