This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2020 at 10:48:22 (UTC).

Pagan v. Oriental Bank

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Pagan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Oriental Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01277

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Irmgard Pagan

San Juan, PR 00918

Irmgard Pagan-Rivera

Defendant

oriental bank

254 Ave Muoz Rivera, Esq Ave Chardn, Hato Rey

San Juan, PR 00918

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jose R. Perez-Hernandez

Attorney at Pierluisi Law Offices, PSC

208 Ponce De Leon Ave., Popular Center, Suite 1428

Hato Rey, PR 00918-1033

Miguel A. Pagan-Rivera

Attorney at Pagan & Pagan Law Firm

555 Alverio St.

San Juan, PR 00918

Defendant Attorneys

Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez

Attorney at Delgado Fernandez LLC

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

7 #1

Summons

#8

8 #1

Summons

#9

#11

#12

#14

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: Noting #14 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices, Orders, Pleadings and Documents." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/27/2020. (ebb) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of Oriental Bank (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Granting #12 "Oriental Bank's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint or Responsive Pleading." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/27/2020. (MPL) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time until September 4, 2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Irmgard Pagan-Rivera filed by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Bank Responses due by 8/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement byOriental Bank. (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Noting #9 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/24/2020. (ebb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez on behalf of Oriental Bank (Baralt-Suarez, Carlos) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Oriental Bank (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re Issuance of Summons as to Oriental Bank filed by Jose R. Perez-Hernandez on behalf of Irmgard Pagan-Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Perez-Hernandez, Jose) Modified on 7/6/2020 to edit docket title (rom). (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Irmgard Pagan-Rivera (Perez-Hernandez, Jose) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Irmgard Pagan-Rivera (Perez-Hernandez, Jose) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt number 0104-6926531 (arg) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/11/2020. (arg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1 Oriental Bank. COMPLAINT, filed by Irmgard Pagan, re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 6/12/2020. (arg) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/11/2020 to correct case number in pdf document) (mcm). (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against oriental bank, filed by Irmgard Pagan. Service due by 9/8/2020,(Perez-Hernandez, Jose) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oriental Bank is a litigant