This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2020 at 08:19:20 (UTC).

Pagan v. C.I. Lobster Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Pagan filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against C I Lobster Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07349

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Pagan

Defendants

John Mandarino

Richard Mandarino

C.I. Lobster Corporation

Joseph Mandarino

C.I. Lobster Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Finn Walter Dusenbery

Attorney at Law Office of Finn W. Dusenbery

57 W. 57 Street, 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Robert Walter Ottinger, Jr

Attorney at The Ottinger Firm, P.C.

401 Park Avenue South, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Emanuel Kataev

Attorney at Milman Labuda Law Group, PLLC

3000 Marcus Avenue, Suite 3W8

New Hyde Park, NY 11042

Richard I Milman

Attorney at Milman Labuda Law Group PLLC

3000 Marcus Ave.

Lake Success, NY 11042

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/9/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/10/19) (rpr) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/27/2020) (js) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard I Milman on behalf of C.I. Lobster Corp., John Mandarino, Joseph Mandarino, Richard Mandarino..(Milman, Richard) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Finn Dusenbery dated October 25, 2020 re: Opposition to Mandatory Mediation Referral. Document filed by Joseph Pagan..(Dusenbery, Finn) (Entered: 10/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and motion for referral to mandatory mediation addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Emanuel Kataev, Esq. dated October 23, 2020. Document filed by C.I. Lobster Corp., John Mandarino, Joseph Mandarino, Richard Mandarino..(Kataev, Emanuel) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emanuel Kataev on behalf of C.I. Lobster Corp., John Mandarino, Joseph Mandarino, Richard Mandarino..(Kataev, Emanuel) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. C.I. Lobster Corp. served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020; John Mandarino served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020; Joseph Mandarino served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020; Richard Mandarino served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. Service was accepted by Richard Mandarino - Owner. Document filed by Joseph Pagan..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Joseph Pagan..(Ottinger, Robert) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. So Ordered. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter motion for permission to re-file ECF No. 6. ECF No. 8. This request is GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to publicly file a redacted version of the Consent to Sue Under FLSA and email an unredacted version to Chambers. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to strike ECF No. 6. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/2/2020) (js) Modified on 10/6/2020 (js). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Consent to Sue Under FLSA addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Finn Dusenbery dated September 24, 2020. Document filed by Joseph Pagan..(Dusenbery, Finn) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Finn Walter Dusenbery. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: C.I. Lobster Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Finn Walter Dusenbery. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Finn Walter Dusenbery to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Finn Walter Dusenbery to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Finn Walter Dusenbery to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Finn Walter Dusenbery. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Joseph Pagan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21571143)Document filed by Joseph Pagan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons).(Dusenbery, Finn) Modified on 9/10/2020 (pc). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Finn Walter Dusenbery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert W. Ottinger