This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:25:31 (UTC).

Pagan Marrero v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence case was filed by Pagan Marrero against United States of America in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02123

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ismael Pagan Marrero

Defendant

United States of America

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#3

(#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (GSO) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Ismael Pagan Marrero. (CTR) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing the clerk to SEND to the United States a copy of the motion to vacate and supporting memorandum; directing the United States, by 11/18/2019, to show cause why relief should not be granted; reply due 12/23/2019 or thirty days after the response, whichever occurs later. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/3/2019. (BK) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-192-T-23CPT filed by Ismael Pagan Marrero. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER directing the clerk to SEND to the United States a copy of the motion to vacate and supporting memorandum; directing the United States, by 11/18/2019, to show cause why relief should not be granted; reply due 12/23/2019 or thirty days after the response, whichever occurs later. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/3/2019. (BK) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (GSO) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Ismael Pagan Marrero. (CTR) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-192-T-23CPT filed by Ismael Pagan Marrero. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less