This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:51:33 (UTC).

Paez Hernandez v. USA et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Paez Hernandez filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Blackburn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03431

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Blackburn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Paez Hernandez

Defendants

Kristi Barrows

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

United States of America

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn David Meade

Attorney at MyRights Immigration Law Firm

8205 East Colfax Avenue

Denver, CO 80220

Defendant Attorney

Kyle W. Brenton

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/06/2019. (athom, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of Kristi Barrows, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USAAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party Kristi Barrows(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party USA(pty:dft) (Brenton, Kyle) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Plaintiff Maria Paez Hernandez (Meade, Shawn) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/06/2019. (athom, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kristi Barrows by Plaintiff Maria Paez Hernandez. (Meade, Shawn) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS REQUEST as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by Plaintiff Maria Paez Hernandez. (Meade, Shawn) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States of America by Plaintiff Maria Paez Hernandez. (Meade, Shawn) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7030393)Attorney Shawn David Meade added to party Maria Paez Hernandez(pty:pla), filed by Maria Paez Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Meade, Shawn) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.