This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2023 at 08:31:35 (UTC).

Padilla v. Nevada Gaming Control Board et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 Padilla filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nevada Gaming Control Board. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and Richard F. Boulware, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02109

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Padilla

Defendants

Nevada Gaming Control Board

MGM Grand Hotel, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raffi A. Nahabedian

Attorney at Law Office of Raffi A. Nahabedian

7408 Doe Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Somps

Attorney at Nevada Attorney General

5420 Kietzke Lane, Ste 202

Reno, NV 89511

Tiffany E. Breinig

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

555 E. Washington Ave. Ste 3900

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7151773) by Shawn Padilla. Proof of service due by 3/20/2023. (Nahabedian, Raffi) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Claimant Shawn Padilla. (Nahabedian, Raffi) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shawn Padilla. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Nahabedian, Raffi) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Summons

5 #2

Summons

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Summons

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Padilla. Shawn Padilla served on 1/30/2023. (Nahabedian, Raffi) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#8

(#8) First MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Nevada Gaming Control Board. Responses due by 2/23/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/26/2023. (Alanis, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Somps on behalf of Defendant Nevada Gaming Control Board. (Somps, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tiffany E. Breinig on behalf of Defendant Nevada Gaming Control Board. (Breinig, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Defendant Nevada Gaming Control Board. Deputy Attorney General Michelle D Alanis terminated. Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Alanis, Michelle) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Defendant Nevada Gaming Control Board. Deputy Attorney General Michelle D Alanis terminated. Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Alanis, Michelle) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tiffany E. Breinig on behalf of Defendant Nevada Gaming Control Board. (Breinig, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Somps on behalf of Defendant Nevada Gaming Control Board. (Somps, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Nevada Gaming Control Board. Responses due by 2/23/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/26/2023. (Alanis, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Padilla. Shawn Padilla served on 1/30/2023. (Nahabedian, Raffi) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MGM Grand Hotel, LLC, Nevada Gaming Control Board re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KF) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Nevada Gaming Control Board; MGM Grand Hotel, LLC by Plaintiff Shawn Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Nahabedian, Raffi) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (LOE) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shawn Padilla. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Nahabedian, Raffi) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Claimant Shawn Padilla. (Nahabedian, Raffi) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7151773) by Shawn Padilla. Proof of service due by 3/20/2023. (Nahabedian, Raffi) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less