Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 13:56:43 (UTC).

Padilla v. GEICO General Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Padilla filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing, Steven C. Yarbrough and Martha Vazquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00633

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

Presiding Judges

Steven C. Yarbrough

Martha Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Padilla

Defendants

GEICO General Insurance Company

John Does

Randi Sparks

Jay Lampierre

Michael Henderson

Eduardo Lemus

Jane Does

Don Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Anthony Bleus

Attorney at Bleus & Associates, LLC

2633 Dakota, N.E.

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey M. Mitchell

Attorney at Law Office of O'Brien and Padilla, P.C.

6000 Indian School Rd., Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Daniel J O'Brien

Attorney at OBrien & Padilla, P.C.

6000 Indian School Rd Ne, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Penelope M. Quintero

Attorney at Davis Miles McGuire Gardner, PLLC

320 Gold Ave. Sw, Ste. 1111

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Jay Lampierre. (Perry, Meloney) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Veronica Padilla re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Remand to State District Court filed by Veronica Padilla (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#26

(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Remand to State District Court Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State District Court filed by Veronica Padilla. (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#25

(#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Padilla. Eduardo Lemus served on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#24

(#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Padilla. Jay Lampierre served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#23

(#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Padilla. Don Brown served on 7/26/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Party Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Don Brown. (Quintero, Penelope) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Dismiss Party Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Don Brown. (Quintero, Penelope) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#13

(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Remand to State District Court Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State District Court filed by Veronica Padilla. (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Randi Sparks. (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#7

(#7) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#6

(#6) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Mitchell on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO General Insurance Company for GEICO General Insurance Company. (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson. (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#7) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Jay Lampierre. (Perry, Meloney) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Veronica Padilla re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Remand to State District Court filed by Veronica Padilla (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiff's Motion and Supporting Memorandum to Remand to State District Court Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Response Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State District Court filed by Veronica Padilla. (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Padilla. Eduardo Lemus served on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Padilla. Jay Lampierre served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Padilla. Don Brown served on 7/26/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Party Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Don Brown. (Quintero, Penelope) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss Party Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by Don Brown. (Quintero, Penelope) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by Veronica Padilla re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, Stipulated Notice of Extension (Bleus, George) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE by Veronica Padilla Entry of Appearance (Quintero, Penelope) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Randi Sparks. (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7192599 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docket(#5) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Mitchell on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO General Insurance Company for GEICO General Insurance Company. (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson. (Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2020-01030. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Michael Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Anthony Bleus