This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2020 at 08:17:29 (UTC).

Padilla Flores v. Triple-S Vida, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Padilla Flores filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Triple-S Vida, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02063

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francisco Padilla Flores

Manat, PR 00674

Francisco Padilla-Flores

Manati, PR 00674

Defendant

Triple-S Vida, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez

Attorney at Sanabria Bauermeister Garcia & Berio LLC

Po Box 363068

San Juan, PR 00936-3068

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Exhibit A2

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents MOTION for Extension of Time until December 12, 2019 to file Certified Translations filed by Triple-S Vida, Inc. filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Vida, Inc. Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A2)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Defendant Triple-S Vida, Inc..(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until December 12, 2019 to file Certified Translations filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Vida, Inc. Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion submitting Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/26/2019. (EES) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents MOTION for Extension of Time until December 12, 2019 to file Certified Translations filed by Triple-S Vida, Inc. filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Vida, Inc. Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A2)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Defendant Triple-S Vida, Inc..(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until December 12, 2019 to file Certified Translations filed by Jaime Luis Sanabria-Montanez on behalf of Triple-S Vida, Inc. Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of General Justice, Bayamn Superior Court, case number BY2019CV05625. (), filed by Triple-S Vida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Sanabria-Montanez, Jaime) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Triple S Vida, Inc. is a litigant