This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:31:19 (UTC).

Pacumio v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Pacumio filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00251

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josefina Pacumio

Defendants

Clear Recon Corp.

Catamount Properties 2018, LLC

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew David Mellen

Attorney at Mellen Law Firm

1050 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 102

Alameda, CA 94501

Rachel Z. Norby

Attorney at Mellen Law Firm

1050 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 102

Alameda, CA 94501

Brenna Wood Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Mellen Law Firm

1050 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 102

Alameda, CA 94501

Defendant Attorneys

Casper J Rankin

Attorney at Aldridge Pite LLP

44375 Jutland Dr, Suite 247

San Diego, CA 92117

Fred Timothy Winters

Attorney at Aldridge Pite LLP

4375 Jutland Dr., Ste. 200, P.O. Box 17935

San Diego, CA 92177-0935

Dean Allen Reeves

Attorney at Anglin Flewelling Rasmussen Cambel and Trytten, LLP

301 North Lake Avenue, Suite 1100

Pasadena, CA 91101-4158

Robert Arthur Bailey

Attorney at Anglin, Flewelling, Rasmussen, Campbell & Trytten, LLP

301 North Lake Avenue, Suite 1100

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Declaration Declaration of Brenna Wood Fitzpatrick In Support of Motion for Rema

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#1

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#21

(#21) Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #6 Motion to Remand. The hearing and case management conference set for March 13, 2020 is VACATED. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#17

(#17) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Remand ) filed byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#20

(#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clear Recon Corp., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Filed byJosefina Pacumio. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A-J in Support of Notice of Removal

6 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service

18 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service

#4

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #4 Case Management Scheduling Order, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero's Standing Order and Other Court Generated Documents Upon Removal. (Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/16/2020) Modified on 1/16/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#18

(#18) Certificate of Interested Entities by Clear Recon Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Steven W. Pite, Other Affiliate John G. Aldridge for Clear Recon Corp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winters, Fred) (Filed on 1/31/2020) Modified on 2/3/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #3

Defendant Clear Recon Corp's Consent to Removal by Wells Fargo Bank, NA

#23

(#23) Receipt from San Francsico Superior Court for remand documents. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #4 Case Management Scheduling Order, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero's Standing Order and Other Court Generated Documents Upon Removal. (Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/16/2020) Modified on 1/16/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#19

(#19) REPLY (re #6 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJosefina Pacumio. (Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

20 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#22

(#22) CLERK'S NOTICE remanding case to San Francisco Superior Court. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Receipt from San Francsico Superior Court for remand documents. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CLERK'S NOTICE remanding case to San Francisco Superior Court. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #6 Motion to Remand. The hearing and case management conference set for March 13, 2020 is VACATED. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clear Recon Corp., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Filed byJosefina Pacumio. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPLY (re #6 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJosefina Pacumio. (Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Certificate of Interested Entities by Clear Recon Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Steven W. Pite, Other Affiliate John G. Aldridge for Clear Recon Corp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winters, Fred) (Filed on 1/31/2020) Modified on 2/3/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Remand ) filed byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #6 MOTION to Remand . Regardless of whether the Court reschedules the hearing date, all opposition and reply papers shall be timely filed pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-7(d). Motion Hearing re-set for 3/13/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Related documents(s) #10 , #6 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Catamount Properties 2018 LLC by Josefina Pacumio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Dismissal of Catamount)(Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 1/29/2020) Modified on 1/30/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Certificate of Interested Entities. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #14 Notice (Other) filed by Clear Recon Corp. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 2/4/2020. Replies due by 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Josefina Pacumio.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byClear Recon Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Winters, Fred) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/28/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Remand filed by Josefina Pacumio. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 1/30/2020. Replies due by 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brenna Wood Fitzpatrick In Support of Motion for Remand, #2 Certificate of Service)(Fitzpatrick, Brenna) (Filed on 1/16/2020) Modified on 1/17/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #4 Case Management Scheduling Order, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero's Standing Order and Other Court Generated Documents Upon Removal. (Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/16/2020) Modified on 1/16/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-580703. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14063032). Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 *** Copy of COMPLAINT attached *** - Exhibit A-J in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Defendant Clear Recon Corp's Consent to Removal by Wells Fargo Bank, NA)(Reeves, Dean) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/14/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.