This case was last updated from PACER on 06/20/2021 at 13:38:58 (UTC).

PACSEC3, LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 PACSEC3, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Juniper Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00387

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACSEC3, LLC

Defendant

Juniper Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam and Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Juniper Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACSEC3, LLC. Juniper Networks, Inc. served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by PACSEC3, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit US7523497

1 #2

Exhibit US7047564

1 #1

Exhibit US6789190

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14721537), filed by PACSEC3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US6789190, #2 Exhibit US7047564, #3 Exhibit US7523497, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Juniper Networks, Inc. answer due 6/27/2021. (lad) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Juniper Networks, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is June 27, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Juniper Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc.. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Juniper Networks, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PACSEC3, LLC. Juniper Networks, Inc. served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. Please make sure all documents e-filed are flattened before e-filing (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by PACSEC3, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14721537), filed by PACSEC3, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US6789190, #2 Exhibit US7047564, #3 Exhibit US7523497, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Juniper Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACSEC3, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Richards Smith