This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 at 07:04:22 (UTC).

Packet Intelligence LLC v. Juniper Networks Inc

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 Packet Intelligence LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Juniper Networks Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-04741

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Packet Intelligence LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Juniper Networks Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brian A. E. Smith

Attorney at Bartko Zankel Bunzel & Miller

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeffrey Daniel Chen

Attorney at Bartko, Zankel, Bunzel & Miller

One Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joseph John Fraresso

Attorney at Bartko Zankel Bunzel & Miller

One Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alden Kwong Wei Lee

Attorney at Bartko Zankel Bunzel & Miller

One Embarcadero Center, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jonathan T. Suder

Attorney at Friedman Suder & Cooke

604 East 4Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Dave Ross Gunter

Attorney at Friedman Suder Cooke

604 East 4Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Corby R. Vowell

Attorney at Friedman, Suder & Cooke, PC

604 East 4Th Street, Suite 200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Michael F. Heim

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush LLP

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Robert Allan Bullwinkel

Attorney at Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Christopher Michael First

Attorney at Heim, Payne Chorush LLP

1111 Bagby Street, Suite 2100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Roy William Sigler

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Alan Michael Fisch

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Jeffrey M Saltman

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Adam A. Allgood

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Ken K. Fung

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

400 Concar Drive

San Mateo, CA 94402

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Packet Intelligence LLC of Case Management Order (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 10/11/2019) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#22

(#22) Certificate of Interested Entities by Juniper Networks Inc (Fisch, Alan) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Packet Intelligence LLC byJuniper Networks Inc. (Fisch, Alan) (Filed on 10/9/2019) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Allgood (Allgood, Adam) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#19

(#19) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Saltman. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#18

(#18) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Alan M. Fisch. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - Certificate of Good Standing

#16

(#16) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey M. Saltman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13764126.) filed by Juniper Networks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Saltman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - Certificate of Good Standing

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2019) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Packet Intelligence LLC byJuniper Networks Inc. (Fisch, Alan) (Filed on 10/9/2019) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Packet Intelligence LLC of Case Management Order (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 10/11/2019) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Certificate of Interested Entities by Juniper Networks Inc (Fisch, Alan) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Packet Intelligence LLC byJuniper Networks Inc. (Fisch, Alan) (Filed on 10/9/2019) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Allgood (Allgood, Adam) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey M. Saltman. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Alan M. Fisch. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by R. Willliam Sigler. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey M. Saltman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13764126.) filed by Juniper Networks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Saltman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for R. William Sigler ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13764122.) filed by Juniper Networks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Sigler, Roy) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Alan M. Fisch ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13764113.) filed by Juniper Networks Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Fisch, Alan) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Packet Intelligence LLC. Juniper Networks Inc served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RELATING CASE to Case No. 3:19cv2471-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/21/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Juniper Networks Inc. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Packet Intelligence LLC identifying Corporate Parent Packet Intelligence LLC for Packet Intelligence LLC. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2019) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2019) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Juniper Networks Inc (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13606984.). Filed by Packet Intelligence LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/15/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Packet Intelligence LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Juniper Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey M Saltman