Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/26/2019 at 07:32:44 (UTC).

Pack v. Mast

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Pack filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Mast. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip P Simon and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00501

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Pack

Defendant

Trent Mast

Middlebury, IN 46540

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James E Ayers

Attorney at Wernle Ristine & Ayers LPC

309 Dubois Ave, Po Box 874

Crawfordsville, IN 47933

Defendant Attorney

James F Groves

Attorney at Lee Groves and Zalas

205 W Jefferson Blvd Ste 502

South Bend, IN 46601

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trent Mast. (Groves, James) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#11

(#11) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trent Mast.(Groves, James) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James F Groves on behalf of Trent Mast (Groves, James) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#9

(#9) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kevin Pack. Amendment to #1 Complaint, #8 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, . (Ayers, James) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Withdraw. Having granted Plaintiff's motion to withdraw, the Court now DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiff's motion to amend #2 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to strike Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 [1-1] and ORDERS Plaintiff to re-file Exhibit 1, without page 8, no later than 07/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 07/16/2019. (jat) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#7

(#7) Proposed Pretrial Order to Withdraw Page 8 of Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint from Record by Kevin Pack. (Ayers, James) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Withdraw Page 8 of Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint from Record re #4 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, #2 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, , #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kevin Pack. (Ayers, James) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James E Ayers on behalf of Kevin Pack (Ayers, James) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Motion to Amend/Correct Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint to allow Plaintiff to (1) specify which parts of Exhibit 1 he would like redacted and (2) provide any additional authority and good cause he deems necessary under the Citizens standard for the requested redactions by 7/15/2019. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to maintain Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 to his Complaint under seal until the Court resolves the motion to redact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/1/19. (jld) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kevin Pack. (Ayers, James) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3936965.), filed by Kevin Pack. (Attachments: #1 ***STRICKEN pursuant to #8 Order*** Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons). (Ayers, James) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trent Mast. (Groves, James) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trent Mast.(Groves, James) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James F Groves on behalf of Trent Mast (Groves, James) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kevin Pack. Amendment to #1 Complaint, #8 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, . (Ayers, James) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Withdraw. Having granted Plaintiff's motion to withdraw, the Court now DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiff's motion to amend #2 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to strike Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 [1-1] and ORDERS Plaintiff to re-file Exhibit 1, without page 8, no later than 07/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 07/16/2019. (jat) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Pretrial Order to Withdraw Page 8 of Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint from Record by Kevin Pack. (Ayers, James) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION to Withdraw Page 8 of Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint from Record re #4 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, #2 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, , #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kevin Pack. (Ayers, James) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James E Ayers on behalf of Kevin Pack (Ayers, James) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Motion to Amend/Correct Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint to allow Plaintiff to (1) specify which parts of Exhibit 1 he would like redacted and (2) provide any additional authority and good cause he deems necessary under the Citizens standard for the requested redactions by 7/15/2019. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to maintain Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 to his Complaint under seal until the Court resolves the motion to redact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/1/19. (jld) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Trent Mast. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kevin Pack. (Ayers, James) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3936965.), filed by Kevin Pack. (Attachments: #1 ***STRICKEN pursuant to #8 Order*** Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons). (Ayers, James) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James F. Graves