This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2021 at 08:31:44 (UTC).

Pacific Life Insurance Company v. Blevins

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Pacific Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blevins. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Pacific Life Insurance Company

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Katie Blevins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Paul D. Waddell

Attorney at Waddell, Cole & Jones, PLLC

Arkansas 310 East Street, Suite A

Jonesboro, AR 72401

Sam Waddell

Attorney at Waddell, Cole & Jones, PLLC

Arkansas 310 East Street, Suite A

Jonesboro, AR 72401

Joshua Robert Hess

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203-2618

Thomas J. Butler

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203-2618

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Jim Lyons

Attorney at Lyons & Cone, PLC

Post Office Box 7044

Jonesboro, AR 72403-7044

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Proposed Final Scheduling Order

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Pacific Life Insurance Company.(Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/1/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/15/2021. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 9/12/2022 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 and #6 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Pacific Life Insurance Company. Thomas J. Butler and Joshua R. Hess are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 08/26/2021. (llg) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joshua R. Hess. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4084036. Filed by Pacific Life Insurance Company (Waddell, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Thomas J. Butler. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4084029. Filed by Pacific Life Insurance Company (Waddell, Paul) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jim Lyons on behalf of Katie Blevins (Lyons, Jim) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Pacific Life Insurance Company by Katie Blevins.(Lyons, Jim) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Katie Blevins. Returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) filed by Pacific Life Insurance Company. (wbb) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Katie Blevins filed by Pacific Life Insurance Company. Fee $402; Receipt No. JON000976. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jim Lyons