This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 at 07:31:26 (UTC).

Pacific 1 LLC

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 Pacific 1 LLC was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01271

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific 1 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Patrick Barcott

Attorney at HOLMES WEDDLE & BARCOTT

999 Third Ave, Ste 2600

Seattle, WA 98104

Michael A Barcott

Attorney at HOLMES WEDDLE & BARCOTT

999 Third Ave, Ste 2600

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Ex Parte Motion to Hold Action in Abeyance. On or before October 31, 2019, Limitation Plaintiff shall advise the Court of the status of the settlement of the claims. If settlement is not reached by that date, the Court will decide how to proceed at that time. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Hold Action in Abeyance , filed by Plaintiff Pacific 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/13/2019, (Barcott, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific 1 LLC (Barcott, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Posting of Security for Costs ; filed by Plaintiff Pacific 1 LLC. (Barcott, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability against defendant(s) Pacific 1 LLC (Receipt # 0981-5883076) Attorney Michael A Barcott added to party Pacific 1 LLC(pty:pla), filed by Pacific 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barcott, Michael) Modified on 8/13/2019 to remove "defendant" language (KB). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Ex Parte Motion to Hold Action in Abeyance. On or before October 31, 2019, Limitation Plaintiff shall advise the Court of the status of the settlement of the claims. If settlement is not reached by that date, the Court will decide how to proceed at that time. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Hold Action in Abeyance , filed by Plaintiff Pacific 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/13/2019, (Barcott, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific 1 LLC (Barcott, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Posting of Security for Costs ; filed by Plaintiff Pacific 1 LLC. (Barcott, Michael) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Exoneration from and/or Limitation of Liability against defendant(s) Pacific 1 LLC (Receipt # 0981-5883076) Attorney Michael A Barcott added to party Pacific 1 LLC(pty:pla), filed by Pacific 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barcott, Michael) Modified on 8/13/2019 to remove "defendant" language (KB). (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less