This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 10:13:35 (UTC).

Pace v. Wright Medical Technology et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Pace filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dustin B. Pead, Ted Stewart and Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00724

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jared C. Bennett

Presiding Judges

Dustin B. Pead

Ted Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gale Pace

Coalville, UT 84017

Defendants

Wright Medical Technology

Wright Medical Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Elisabeth M. McOmber

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

111 S Main St Ste 600

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDERED that Plaintiff respond to this Order in writing by February 7, 2022, to attempt to demonstrate cause as to why this action should not be dismissed and his intentions to proceed. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/25/2022. (reb) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 14 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Gale Pace, Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. Form due by 1/3/2022. (alf) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology identifying Wright Medical Group, Inc., which is an indirect wholly-owned subsidiary of Stryker Corporation. as Corporate Parent. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

5 #2

Exhibit B - JCCP

5 #1

Exhibit A - Fugal Affidavit

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

3 #3

Notice of Removal

3 #2

Cover Sheet

3 #1

Complaint

3 #3

Main Document

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Federal

2 #1

Exhibit State Case Docket_Complaint_civil cover sheet (state)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Summit County, case number 210500393, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BUTDC-4190375) filed by Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Case Docket_Complaint_civil cover sheet (state), #2 Civil Cover Sheet Federal) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Wright Medical Technology is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDERED that Plaintiff respond to this Order in writing by February 7, 2022, to attempt to demonstrate cause as to why this action should not be dismissed and his intentions to proceed. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/25/2022. (reb) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/11/2022. (tlc) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#8) The deadline for submission of Consent/Reassignment forms has now passed. The parties failed to file, therefore the case is ineligible for magistrate assignment. Case randomly assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 14 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Gale Pace, Defendants Wright Medical Group, Wright Medical Technology. Form due by 1/3/2022. (alf) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology identifying Wright Medical Group, Inc., which is an indirect wholly-owned subsidiary of Stryker Corporation. as Corporate Parent. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Wright Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fugal Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - JCCP) Attorney Elisabeth M. McOmber added to party Wright Medical Group(pty:dft)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) File downloaded from Third District, Summit County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Removal) (alf) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Summit County, case number 210500393, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BUTDC-4190375) filed by Wright Medical Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Case Docket_Complaint_civil cover sheet (state), #2 Civil Cover Sheet Federal) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Defendant Wright Medical Technology is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elisabeth M. McOmber