This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2020 at 10:27:08 (UTC).

Pace, M.D. v. Granite City Clinic Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 Pace, M D filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Granite City Clinic Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reona J. Daly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00674

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reona J. Daly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Paul J. Pace, M.D.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Granite City Clinic Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

William M. Lawson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, et al - St. Louis

7700 Bonhomme Avenue, Suite 650

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Robert S. Burtker

Attorney at Brennan Burtker LLC

20 N. Clark Street, Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #14 Counterclaim by Paul J. Pace, M.D..(Lawson, William) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#25

(#25) ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery filed by Paul J. Pace, M.D. Responses to written discovery shall be served by 8/25/2020. Depositions shall be completed by 10/12/2020. Status Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/11/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#20

(#20) FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Lawson, William) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

19 #1

Notice of Filing

#19

(#19) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Granite City Clinic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Burtker, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission by Attorney Robert S. Burtker $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4244763 by on behalf of Granite City Clinic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Burtker, Robert) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

14 #1

Notice

#14

(#26) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #14 Counterclaim by Paul J. Pace, M.D..(Lawson, William) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Granite City Clinic Corporation. Original mailed to counsel for plaintiff for service. (amv) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Requested. (Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Paul J. Pace, M.D.. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-674-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/31/2020 (amv) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Lawson on behalf of Paul J. Pace, M.D. (Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Paul J. Pace, M.D. Notice of Intent to Use Process Server (Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#2

(#25) ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery filed by Paul J. Pace, M.D. Responses to written discovery shall be served by 8/25/2020. Depositions shall be completed by 10/12/2020. Status Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/11/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Granite City Clinic Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4224026.), filed by Paul J. Pace, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Plaintiff's ANSWER to #14 Counterclaim by Paul J. Pace, M.D..(Lawson, William) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery filed by Paul J. Pace, M.D. Responses to written discovery shall be served by 8/25/2020. Depositions shall be completed by 10/12/2020. Status Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/11/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket(#24) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Status Conference held on 8/11/2020. Attorney William Lawson for Plaintiff and Attorney Robert Burtker for Defendant. An order on the pending motion for expedited discovery to issue. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket(#23) ORDER: Due to a conflict with Plaintiff's counsel's schedule, the Status Conference set for 8/13/2020 is CANCELED and is RESET for 8/11/2020 at 9:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/5/2020. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 9:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. The parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731 to join the call. The plan for the handling of the pending motions will be discussed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/5/2020. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 20-674-RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Lawson, William) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Granite City Clinic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Burtker, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert S. Burtker on behalf of Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Granite City Clinic Corporation. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission by Attorney Robert S. Burtker $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4244763 by on behalf of Granite City Clinic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Burtker, Robert) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul J. Pace, M.D.. Granite City Clinic Corporation served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #8 Return of Service Executed filed by Paul J. Pace, M.D. Filer shall refile using proper event: Civil/ Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STRICKEN RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Paul J. Pace, M.D. on 07/14/2020. (Lawson, William) Modified on 7/17/2020 (amv). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Granite City Clinic Corporation. Original mailed to counsel for plaintiff for service. (amv) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Requested. (Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Paul J. Pace, M.D.. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-674-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 7/31/2020 (amv) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Lawson on behalf of Paul J. Pace, M.D. (Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Paul J. Pace, M.D. Notice of Intent to Use Process Server (Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery by Paul J. Pace, M.D.. (Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Granite City Clinic Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4224026.), filed by Paul J. Pace, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawson, William) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less